This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:25:28 (UTC).

TAHMASEBI v. BARR et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 TAHMASEBI filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against BARR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03648

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen Kollar-Kotelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARSA TAHMASEBI

Defendants

JOHN #1-#10 DOES

CYNTHIA HALEY

MIKE POMPEO

CARL RISCH

Washington, DC 20529

KEVIN MCALEENAN

WILLIAM BARR

CHAD WOLF

JOHN DOES #1-#10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer E. Nimer

Attorney at NIMER LAW LLC

3803 Attucks Drive, Suite A

Powell, OH 43065

Defendant Attorney

Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 13, 2020. (lccck1) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER ESTABLISING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/12/19. (DM) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 13, 2020. (lccck1) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PARSA TAHMASEBI (Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CYNTHIA HALEY served on 12/16/2019; MIKE POMPEO served on 12/16/2019; CARL RISCH served on 12/16/2019 (Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEVIN MCALEENAN served on 12/16/2019 (Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/16/2019. (Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of All Defendants (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER ESTABLISING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/12/19. (DM) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/8/2020. (Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM BARR, CYNTHIA HALEY, KEVIN MCALEENAN, MIKE POMPEO, CARL RISCH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6626866) filed by PARSA TAHMASEBI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons AUSA, #9 Summons USAG, #10 Summons Acting Sec of DHS, #11 Summons Secretary of State, #12 Summons Ass Sec of Cons Affairs, #13 Summons CG Embassy Berlin)(Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less