This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2022 at 06:45:17 (UTC).

Michelle M. Taheripour et al v. U.S. Small Business Administration et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 Michelle M Taheripour filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against U S Small Business Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dolly M. Gee and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09947

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michelle M Taheripour

Law Offices of Michelle Taheripour, APLC

Defendants

U.S. Small Business Administration

Isabella Casillas Guzman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shawn Sedaghat

Attorney at Shawn S Sedaghat ALC

14011 Ventura Boulevard Suite 400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Defendant Attorney

David E Pinchas

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to U.S. Small Business Administration answer now due 3/28/2022; Isabella Casillas Guzman answer now due 3/28/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #2 filed by defendants U.S. Small Business Administration; Isabella Casillas Guzman.(Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Isabella Casillas Guzman(pty:dft), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party U.S. Small Business Administration(pty:dft))(Pinchas, David) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#16

(#16) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#15

(#15) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassign Pursuant to General Order 21-01 filed on 1/24/2022. The case number will now read CV 21-9947-DMG (AGRx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-09947 DMG(AGRx). (rn) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Law Offices of Michelle Taheripour, APLC, Michelle M Taheripour, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to OSCAR OHR (not very clear). Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to OSCAR OHR (not very clear). Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to N/A. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. PROOF OF SERVICE UPON US. ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sedaghat, Shawn) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Law Offices of Michelle Taheripour, APLC, Michelle M Taheripour, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to OSCAR OHR (not very clear). Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to OSCAR OHR (not very clear). Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to N/A. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. PROOF OF SERVICE UPON U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION (Sedaghat, Shawn) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

2 #11

Exhibit

2 #10

Exhibit

2 #9

Exhibit

2 #8

Exhibit

2 #7

Exhibit

2 #6

Exhibit

2 #5

Exhibit

2 #4

Exhibit

2 #3

Exhibit

2 #2

Exhibit

2 #1

Exhibit

2 #2

Main Document

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to U.S. Small Business Administration answer now due 3/28/2022; Isabella Casillas Guzman answer now due 3/28/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #2 filed by defendants U.S. Small Business Administration; Isabella Casillas Guzman.(Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Isabella Casillas Guzman(pty:dft), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party U.S. Small Business Administration(pty:dft))(Pinchas, David) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassign Pursuant to General Order 21-01 filed on 1/24/2022. The case number will now read CV 21-9947-DMG (AGRx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-09947 DMG(AGRx). (rn) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Law Offices of Michelle Taheripour, APLC, Michelle M Taheripour, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to OSCAR OHR (not very clear). Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to OSCAR OHR (not very clear). Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to N/A. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. PROOF OF SERVICE UPON US. ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sedaghat, Shawn) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Law Offices of Michelle Taheripour, APLC, Michelle M Taheripour, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to OSCAR OHR (not very clear). Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to OSCAR OHR (not very clear). Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to N/A. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. PROOF OF SERVICE UPON U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION (Sedaghat, Shawn) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Law Offices of Michelle Taheripour, APLC, Michelle M Taheripour, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to OSCAR OHR (not very clear). Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to OSCAR OHR (not very clear). Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to N/A. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. PROOF OF SERVICE UPON ISABELLA CASILLAS GUZMAN, U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION (Sedaghat, Shawn) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Law Offices of Michelle Taheripour, APLC, Michelle M Taheripour, upon Defendant Isabella Casillas Guzman served on 12/30/2021, answer due 2/28/2022; U.S. Small Business Administration served on 12/30/2021, answer due 2/28/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to OSCAR OHR (not very clear). Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to OSCAR OHR (not very clear). Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to OSCAR OHR (not very clear). Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Sedaghat, Shawn) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 as to Defendants Isabella Casillas Guzman, U.S. Small Business Administration. (ghap) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #2 filed by plaintiff Michelle M Taheripour. (Sedaghat, Shawn) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATON AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michelle M Taheripour, (Sedaghat, Shawn) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Law Offices of Michelle Taheripour, APLC, Michelle M Taheripour. (Sedaghat, Shawn) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($402.00 paid on 12/27/2021, receipt number 32535545), ACACDC-32535545, filed by plaintiff Law Offices of Michelle Taheripour, APLC, Michelle M Taheripour. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit) (Attorney Shawn Sedaghat added to party Law Offices of Michelle Taheripour, APLC(pty:pla), Attorney Shawn Sedaghat added to party Michelle M Taheripour(pty:pla))(Sedaghat, Shawn) Modified on 12/28/2021 (ghap). (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (ghap) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David E Pinchas