This case was last updated from PACER on 03/16/2020 at 07:32:25 (UTC).

Taerim Co., Ltd v. LGB, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 Taerim Co , Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against LGB, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alka Sagar and Consuelo B. Marshall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00475

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

Presiding Judge

Consuelo B. Marshall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taerim Co., Ltd

Defendants

Pacific Eurotex Corp.

Lord & Taylor, LLC

DOES 1 through 10

J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.

LGB, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Taerim Co., Ltd. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Taerim Co., Ltd. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Lord and Taylor, LLC, identifying Taerim Co., Ltd.; LGB, Inc.; J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.; Pacific Eurotex Corp.; Lord & Taylor, LLC. (Baum, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Pacific Eurotex Corp..(Baum, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#22

(#22) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. identifying J. C. Penney Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Garner, Lara) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., LGB, Inc., Lord and Taylor, LLC, Pacific Eurotex Corp. (esa) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#18

(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant LGB, Inc. (Garner, Lara) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pacific Eurotex Corp., identifying Taerim Co., Ltd.; LGB, Inc.; J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.; Pacific Eurotex Corp.; Lord & Taylor, LLC. (Baum, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Taerim Co., Ltd, upon Defendant J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. served on 1/20/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company c/o Amy McLaren\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Lord and Taylor, LLC.(Attorney Michael Charles Baum added to party Lord and Taylor, LLC(pty:dft))(Baum, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#23

(#23) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (ys) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Taerim Co., Ltd, (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#1

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Pacific Eurotex Corp..(Baum, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc..(Garner, Lara) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Taerim Co., Ltd. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant LGB, Inc..(Attorney Lara S Garner added to party LGB, Inc.(pty:dft))(Garner, Lara) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (ys) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. identifying J. C. Penney Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Garner, Lara) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc..(Garner, Lara) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Lord and Taylor, LLC, identifying Taerim Co., Ltd.; LGB, Inc.; J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.; Pacific Eurotex Corp.; Lord & Taylor, LLC. (Baum, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Lord and Taylor, LLC.(Attorney Michael Charles Baum added to party Lord and Taylor, LLC(pty:dft))(Baum, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant LGB, Inc. (Garner, Lara) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant LGB, Inc..(Attorney Lara S Garner added to party LGB, Inc.(pty:dft))(Garner, Lara) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pacific Eurotex Corp., identifying Taerim Co., Ltd.; LGB, Inc.; J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.; Pacific Eurotex Corp.; Lord & Taylor, LLC. (Baum, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Pacific Eurotex Corp..(Baum, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Taerim Co., Ltd, upon Defendant LGB, Inc. served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Peter Riedel\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Taerim Co., Ltd, upon Defendant Pacific Eurotex Corp. served on 1/20/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hersel Neman\Authorized Agent for Service of Process in c/o Liansi "Doe" (refused last name) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Taerim Co., Ltd, upon Defendant J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. served on 1/20/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company c/o Amy McLaren\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., LGB, Inc., Lord and Taylor, LLC, Pacific Eurotex Corp. (esa) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Taerim Co., Ltd. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Taerim Co., Ltd. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Taerim Co., Ltd, (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Taerim Co., Ltd. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25140351 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Taerim Co., Ltd. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Taerim Co., Ltd(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.