This case was last updated from PACER on 11/01/2020 at 10:12:42 (UTC).

Taebel v. University of Virginia

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 Taebel filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against University of Virginia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Glen E. Conrad. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00052

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Glen E. Conrad

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mitch Taebel

Phoenix, AZ 85003

Defendant

University of Virginia

 

Court Documents

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00314. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

#3

(#3) ORDER transferring case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 9/1/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/02/2020)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) Letter from Mitch Taebel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (shk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/2/2020.]

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against University of Virginia, filed by Mitch Taebel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(File stamped copy mailed to pro se party)(shk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/2/2020.]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00314. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER transferring case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 9/1/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter from Mitch Taebel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (shk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/2/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against University of Virginia, filed by Mitch Taebel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(File stamped copy mailed to pro se party)(shk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/2/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less