This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/12/2021 at 09:37:35 (UTC).

Taebel v. Google, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 Taebel filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Google, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joshua P Kolar and Theresa L Springmann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00313

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joshua P Kolar

Presiding Judge

Theresa L Springmann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mitch Taebel

Long Beach, IN 46360

Respondents

Google, Inc.

Youtube, LLC

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Envelope

#2

(#2) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 10/27/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party, cert mail 7020 1640 0000 2334 9150)(lhc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

3 #3

*Restricted*

3 #1

Correct Judgment

#4

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed on 10/30 as to #2 Order Dismissing Case, #3 Clerks Judgment, filed by Mitch Taebel. (mrm) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed on 10/30 as to #2 Order Dismissing Case, #3 Clerks Judgment, filed by Mitch Taebel. (mrm) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party, cert mail 7020 1640 0000 2334 9150) (lhc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2021: #1 Correct Judgment) (lhc). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 10/27/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party, cert mail 7020 1640 0000 2334 9150)(lhc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, filed by Mitch Taebel. (No filing fee or IFP received, no proposed summons or USM 285 Forms received) (Copy of complaint mailed to Mr. Taebel). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(jdb) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YOUTUBE is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant