This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 16:28:21 (UTC).

Tabor v. Cox Operating, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 Tabor filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Cox Operating, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis van Meerveld and Ivan L.R. Lemelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-11859

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

Presiding Judge

Ivan L.R. Lemelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cindy Lirette Tabor

Defendants

Cox Operating, L.L.C.

Life Line Technologies, LLC

Energy XXI Gulf Coast LLC

Energy XXI GOM, LLC

Energy XXI Gulf Coast Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Letourneau

Attorney at Chopin Law Firm LLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 1550

New Orleans, LA 70130

Justin McCarthy Chopin

Attorney at Chopin Law Firm LLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 1550

New Orleans, LA 70130

Richard A Chopin

Attorney at The Chopin Law Firm

650 Poydras Street, Suite 1550

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

E. John Litchfield

Attorney at Berrigan & Litchfield, LLC

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 4204

New Orleans, LA 70170

Carey Buckland Daste

Attorney at Berrigan & Litchfield, LLC

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 4204

New Orleans, LA 70170

Lorraine Perkins McInnis

Attorney at Berrigan & Litchfield, LLC

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 4204

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Life Line Technologies, LLC by Cindy Lirette Tabor. (Letourneau, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

7 #3

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

7 #2

Exhibit

7 #1

Memorandum in Support

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule FRCP 12(b)(6) by Life Line Technologies, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission)(McInnis, Lorraine) Modified text on 8/27/2019 (jls). (Entered: 08/26/2019)

6 #3

Summons Life Line Summons Return

6 #2

Summons Energy XXI GOM Summons Return

6 #1

Summons Energy XXI Summons Return

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Cox Operating, L.L.C. served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; Energy XXI GOM, LLC served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; Energy XXI Gulf Coast LLC served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; Life Line Technologies, LLC served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Energy XXI Summons Return, #2 Summons Energy XXI GOM Summons Return, #3 Summons Life Line Summons Return)(Letourneau, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Life Line Technologies, LLC. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/16/2019. (ko) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Life Line Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Lorraine Perkins McInnis added to party Life Line Technologies, LLC (pty:dft).(McInnis, Lorraine) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7772870) filed by Cindy Lirette Tabor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)Attorney Michael Letourneau added to party Cindy Lirette Tabor(pty:pla).(Letourneau, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Life Line Technologies, LLC by Cindy Lirette Tabor. (Letourneau, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule FRCP 12(b)(6) by Life Line Technologies, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission)(McInnis, Lorraine) Modified text on 8/27/2019 (jls). (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Cox Operating, L.L.C. served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; Energy XXI GOM, LLC served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; Energy XXI Gulf Coast LLC served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; Life Line Technologies, LLC served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Energy XXI Summons Return, #2 Summons Energy XXI GOM Summons Return, #3 Summons Life Line Summons Return)(Letourneau, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Life Line Technologies, LLC. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/16/2019. (ko) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Life Line Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Lorraine Perkins McInnis added to party Life Line Technologies, LLC (pty:dft).(McInnis, Lorraine) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Cox Operating, L.L.C., Energy XXI GOM, LLC, Energy XXI Gulf Coast LLC, Life Line Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(pp) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7772870) filed by Cindy Lirette Tabor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)Attorney Michael Letourneau added to party Cindy Lirette Tabor(pty:pla).(Letourneau, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Energy XXI GOM, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Energy XXI Gulf Coast, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cox Operating, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Life Technologies Corporation is a litigant