This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2021 at 08:39:34 (UTC).

Tabb v. LVNV Funding LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Tabb filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against LVNV Funding LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gray M Borden and R David Proctor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00854

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Gray M Borden

R David Proctor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tim Tabb

Defendants

Equifax Information Services LLC

LVNV Funding LLC

Trans Union LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

M Stan Herring, Jr

Attorney at WATTS & HERRING LLC

301 19Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

John G Watts

Attorney at WATTS AND HERRING LLC

301 19Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

William Brock Phillips

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER AND GALE

1901 6Th Ave. N, Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203

R Frank Springfield

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN LLP

420 North 20Th Street, Suite 3100

Birmingham, AL 35203

Ryli Wallace Leader

Attorney at BURR AND FORMAN, LLP

420 North 20Th, Ste. 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Matthew Robinett

Attorney at NORMAN WOOD KENDRICK & TURNER

Ridge Park Place, Suite 3000, 1130 22Nd Street South

Birmingham, AL 35205

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#16

15 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

#15

#8

#6

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

2 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

#2

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) TEXT ORDER: This matter is before the court on Defendants Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. #23 The Motion #23 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/19/2021. (KAM) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3903589 (ALND B4601115212). (Phillips, William) Modified on 8/13/2021 (KEK). (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Phillips, William) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to Complaint by LVNV Funding LLC.(Springfield, R) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryli Wallace Leader on behalf of LVNV Funding LLC (Leader, Ryli) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC. (Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/3/2021. (KAM) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor; Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case. The telephone conference set for 8/11/2021 is CANCELLED. (KAM) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. LVNV Funding LLC answer due 8/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 07/22/2021. (SUH) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LVNV Funding LLC. filed by LVNV Funding LLC (Springfield, R) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC. filed by Equifax Information Services LLC (Phillips, William) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Phillips, William) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER granting Trans Union LLC's unopposed #5 Motion for Extension of Time To Respond to the Complaint. Trans Union LLC is ORDERED to file its response to the complaint on or before July 14, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 06/30/2021. (SUH) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC. filed by Trans Union LLC (Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER granting unopposed #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. LVNV Funding LLC is ORDERED to respond to the complaint on or before 7/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 06/30/2021. (SUH) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3874166. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equifax Information Services LLC, LVNV Funding LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 21-901538., filed by Equifax Information Services LLC, LVNV Funding LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KAM). (Phillips, William) NDAL rec#B4601114333. (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ORDER: Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC removed the instant complaint on June 23, 2021. The docket sheet does not reflect payment of the filing fee. Defendant is ORDERED to pay the fee on or before July 7, 2021 or the complaint will be subject to remand without further order.Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 06/30/2021. (SUH) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by LVNV Funding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Springfield, R) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equifax Information Services LLC, LVNV Funding LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 21-901538., filed by Equifax Information Services LLC, LVNV Funding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KAM) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Robinett