Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 04:55:38 (UTC).

Tabat v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 Tabat filed an Other lawsuit against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Klindt and Harvey E. Schlesinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01264

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James R. Klindt

Presiding Judge

Harvey E. Schlesinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rebecca Tabat

Daisy Madrid

Defendants

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. doing business as SPS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Lawrence Kauffman

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser, LLP

1055 Thomas Jefferson Street Nw, Suite 540

Washington, DC 20007

Darren Newhart

Attorney at Consumer Law Organization, PA

721 Us Hwy 1 Ste 201

North Palm Beach, FL 33408-4520

Victor S. Woods

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser LLP

209 Capitol Street

Charleston, WV 25301

Marc Weintraub

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser LLP

Suite 1500, 360 Central Avenue

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

Katherine M. Aizpuru

Attorney at Tycko & Zavareei LLP

1828 L Street Nw Ste 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Hassan A. Zavareei

Attorney at Tycko & Zavareei LLP

1828 L Street Nw Ste 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Alyssa A. Sussman

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

The New York Times Building, 620 Eigth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Kimberly Held Israel

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

Suite 200, 10407 Centurion Parkway N.

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Thomas M. Hefferon

Attorney at Goodwin Procter, LLP

1900 N. Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) ORDER granting #32 Joint Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule on the Issue of Whether This Case Should be Set as a Jury or Non-Jury Trial; cancelling the hearing set for 3/11/2020; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 3/5/2020. (MGG) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#33

(#33) ORDER granting #27 Unopposed Motion for Admission of Victor S. Woods to Practice Pro Hac Vice, Designation of Local Counsel, and Consent to Act. Victor S. Woods is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff with Marc R. Weintraub as local counsel. Mr. Woods shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if he has not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 3/4/2020. (MDC) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#32

(#32) Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Set a Briefing Schedule on the Issue of Whether This Case Should be Set as a Jury or Non-Jury Trial by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Israel, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#31

(#31) ORDER granting #29 and #30 Unopposed Motions for Admission of Hassan A. Zavareei and Katherine M. Aizpuru to Practice Pro Hac Vice, Designations of Local Counsel, and Consents to Act. Hassan A. Zavareei and Katherine M. Aizpuru are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff with Marc R. Weintraub as local counsel. Mr. Zavareei and Ms. Aizpuru shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if they have not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 3/2/2020. (MDC) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#30

(#30) MOTION for Katherine M. Aizpuru to appear pro hac vice by Rebecca Tabat. (Weintraub, Marc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#29

(#29) MOTION for Hassan A. Zavareei to appear pro hac vice by Rebecca Tabat. (Weintraub, Marc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#27

***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Victor S. Woods, appearing on behalf of Rebecca Tabat (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032707.) Related document: #27 MOTION for Victor S. Woods to appear pro hac vice. (AFC) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#22

(#28) NOTICE of hearing: re: #22 Case Management Report (whether the case should be set as a Jury or Non Jury Trial); Miscellaneous Hearing set for 3/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 C before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger. (MGG) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Darren Newhart on behalf of Rebecca Tabat (Newhart, Darren) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead. Defendant shall have up to and including 12/20/2019 to respond to the Class Action Complaint (Doc. No. 1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 11/27/2019. (MDC) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#7

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead. Defendant shall have up to and including 12/20/2019 to respond to the Class Action Complaint (Doc. No. 1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 11/27/2019. (MDC) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#6

(#6) RETURN of service executed on 11/19/2019 by Rebecca Tabat as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Kauffman, James) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (TSW) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Rebecca Tabat re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Kauffman, James) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#3) NOTICE by Rebecca Tabat re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Kauffman, James) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER granting #32 Joint Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule on the Issue of Whether This Case Should be Set as a Jury or Non-Jury Trial; cancelling the hearing set for 3/11/2020; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 3/5/2020. (MGG) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER granting #27 Unopposed Motion for Admission of Victor S. Woods to Practice Pro Hac Vice, Designation of Local Counsel, and Consent to Act. Victor S. Woods is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff with Marc R. Weintraub as local counsel. Mr. Woods shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if he has not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 3/4/2020. (MDC) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Set a Briefing Schedule on the Issue of Whether This Case Should be Set as a Jury or Non-Jury Trial by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Israel, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Victor S. Woods, appearing on behalf of Rebecca Tabat (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032707.) Related document: #27 MOTION for Victor S. Woods to appear pro hac vice. (AFC) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER granting #29 and #30 Unopposed Motions for Admission of Hassan A. Zavareei and Katherine M. Aizpuru to Practice Pro Hac Vice, Designations of Local Counsel, and Consents to Act. Hassan A. Zavareei and Katherine M. Aizpuru are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff with Marc R. Weintraub as local counsel. Mr. Zavareei and Ms. Aizpuru shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if they have not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 3/2/2020. (MDC) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Katherine M. Aizpuru, appearing on behalf of Rebecca Tabat (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032687.) Related document: #30 MOTION for Katherine M. Aizpuru to appear pro hac vice. (AFC) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Hassan A. Zavareei, appearing on behalf of Rebecca Tabat (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032686.) Related document: #29 MOTION for Hassan A. Zavareei to appear pro hac vice. (AFC) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION for Katherine M. Aizpuru to appear pro hac vice by Rebecca Tabat. (Weintraub, Marc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION for Hassan A. Zavareei to appear pro hac vice by Rebecca Tabat. (Weintraub, Marc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of hearing: re: #22 Case Management Report (whether the case should be set as a Jury or Non Jury Trial); Miscellaneous Hearing set for 3/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 C before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger. (MGG) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Alyssa A. Sussman to appear pro hac vice by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Israel, Kimberly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Darren Newhart on behalf of Rebecca Tabat (Newhart, Darren) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead. Defendant shall have up to and including 12/20/2019 to respond to the Class Action Complaint (Doc. No. 1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 11/27/2019. (MDC) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Israel, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN of service executed on 11/19/2019 by Rebecca Tabat as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Kauffman, James) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS issued as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (TSW) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Rebecca Tabat re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Kauffman, James) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-1264-J-20JRK. (SJB) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16094214) filed by Rebecca Tabat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kauffman, James) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Darren R. Newhart

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James L Kauffman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Aizpuru