This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2022 at 09:26:06 (UTC).

Taasera Licensing LLC v. Fortinet Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 Taasera Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Fortinet Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00415

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taasera Licensing LLC

Defendant

Fortinet, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Michael Mercadante

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Peter Lambrianakos

Attorney at Fabricant LLP

411 Theodore Fremd Avenue, Suite 206 South

Rye, NY 10580

Vincent J Rubino, III

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Defendant Attorneys

David C Dotson

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP - Atlanta

1075 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30309-3929

Matthew Christopher Gaudet

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP - Atlanta

1075 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30309-3929

Alice E Snedeker

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP - Atlanta

1075 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30309-3929

Christopher Joseph Tyson

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP - Washington

505 9Th Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-2166

Holly Elin Engelmann

Attorney at Duane Morris, LLP - Dallas

100 Crescent Court, Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75201

Irfan Hassam-Malani

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

190 S. Lasalle Street, Suite 3700

Chicago, IL 60603

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Irfan Hassam-Malani on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Hassam-Malani, Irfan) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#26

(#26) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Fortinet, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#25

(#25) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fortinet, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#24

(#24) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT by Fortinet, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Christopher Gaudet on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Gaudet, Matthew) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alice E Snedeker on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Snedeker, Alice) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Joseph Tyson on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Tyson, Christopher) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David C Dotson on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Dotson, David) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#19

(#19) ORDER - The Court issues this Order sua sponte. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/15/2022 12:15 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/14/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Irfan Hassam-Malani on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Hassam-Malani, Irfan) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Fortinet, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fortinet, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT by Fortinet, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Christopher Gaudet on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Gaudet, Matthew) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alice E Snedeker on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Snedeker, Alice) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Joseph Tyson on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Tyson, Christopher) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David C Dotson on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Dotson, David) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER - The Court issues this Order sua sponte. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/15/2022 12:15 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/14/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER re (40 in 2:22-md-03042-JRG) Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Fortinet, Inc., (14 in 2:22-cv-00415-JRG) Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Fortinet, Inc... Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/14/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Fortinet Inc.. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Michael Mercadante on behalf of Taasera Licensing LLC (Mercadante, Joseph) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Taasera Licensing LLC (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Taasera Licensing LLC (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Taasera Licensing LLC (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Taasera Licensing LLC identifying Corporate Parent Quest Patent Research Corporation for Taasera Licensing LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Fortinet Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9192952.), filed by Taasera Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less