This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/06/2023 at 07:46:28 (UTC).

Taasera Licensing LLC v. CrowdStrike, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 Taasera Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CrowdStrike, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00468

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taasera Licensing LLC

Defendants

CrowdStrike, Inc.

CrowdStrike Holdings, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Jennifer Leigh Truelove

Joseph Michael Mercadante

Peter Lambrianakos

Samuel Franklin Baxter

Vincent J Rubino, III

Raymond W Mort, III

Defendant Attorneys

J Stephen Ravel

Gregory Blake Thompson

Michael J Bettinger

Andrew Thomas Langford

Erik Bruce Fountain

Irene Yang

Irene I Yang

James Mark Mann

Kelly Ransom

Sharon Lee

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Taasera Licensing LLC's Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendant CrowdStrike's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Taasera Licensing LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

33 #1

Exhibit 5

33 #33

Main Document

26 #5

Text of Proposed Order

26 #4

Exhibit 4

26 #3

Exhibit 3

26 #2

Exhibit 2

26 #1

Exhibit 1

26 #26

Main Document

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing on Motion #26 MOTION to Dismiss : IN-PERSON Motion Hearing originally set for 2/2/2023 is RESET for 2/21/2023 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (aeb) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Taasera Licensing LLC's Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendant CrowdStrike's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Taasera Licensing LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CrowdStrike Holdings, Inc, CrowdStrike, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5)(Yang, Irene) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE by Taasera Licensing LLC of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Infringement Contentions as to CrowdStrike, Inc., and CrowdStrike Holdings, Inc. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER - Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/15/2023 11:45 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/18/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Taasera Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 01/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion (21 in 2:21-cv-00441-JRG) MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6), (45 in 2:21-cv-00441-JRG) MOTION to Change Venue PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) FOR TRIAL, (39 in 2:21-cv-00441-JRG) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, (26 in 2:22-cv-00063-JRG) Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Check Point Software Technologies Ltd.'s Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, (23 in 2:22-cv-00063-JRG) Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Defendant Check Point Software Technologies Ltd.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California, (13 in 2:22-cv-00063-JRG) Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Check Point Software Technologies Ltd.'s Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint, (71 in 2:22-md-03042-JRG) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings of Patent-Ineligibility Under 35 USC 101, (89 in 2:22-md-03042-JRG) MOTION to Dismiss , (11 in 2:22-md-03042-JRG) SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (14 in 2:22-cv-00303-JRG) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (87 in 2:22-cv-00314-JRG) SEALED MOTION, (109 in 2:22-cv-00314-JRG) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings of Patent-Ineligibility under 35 USC 101, (89 in 2:22-cv-00314-JRG) SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (26 in 2:22-cv-00468-JRG) MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2023 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/10/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CrowdStrike Holdings, Inc, CrowdStrike, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CrowdStrike Holdings, Inc for CrowdStrike, Inc.. (Yang, Irene) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sharon Lee on behalf of CrowdStrike Holdings, Inc, CrowdStrike, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9299641. (Lee, Sharon) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Dismiss by CrowdStrike Holdings, Inc, CrowdStrike, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Yang, Irene) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2023: #5 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taasera Licensing LLC. CrowdStrike Holdings, Inc served on 10/25/2022, answer due 11/15/2022. (Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2022.] (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taasera Licensing LLC. CrowdStrike, Inc. served on 10/25/2022, answer due 11/15/2022. (Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2022.] (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's standing orders at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/.The following orders were updated on 9/16/22:1. Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases,2. Amended Standing Order On Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2022.] (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to CrowdStrike Holdings, Inc, CrowdStrike, Inc.. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2022.] (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCase Randomly assigned to Judge Alan D Albright pursuant to the Order Assigning Business of the Court as it Relates to Patent Cases, filed 7/25/2022 and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2022.] (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Corrected Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taasera Licensing LLC re #2 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) (Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2022.] (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Taasera Licensing LLC. (Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2022.] (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2022.] (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Taasera Licensing LLC identifying Corporate Parent Quest Patent Research Corporation for Taasera Licensing LLC. (Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2022.] (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16666332), filed by Taasera Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2022.] (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less