This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/28/2022 at 06:39:43 (UTC).

T-Shack, Inc. v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2022 T-Shack, Inc filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Federal National Mortgage Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00688

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

T-Shack, Inc.

Defendants

Federal National Mortgage Association

Quality Loan Service Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher V Yergensen

Attorney at Black & Wadhams

10777 W. Twain Ave. Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Defendant Attorneys

Melanie D Morgan

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Cir., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Natalie L Winslow

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Paige Magaster

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Villagecenter Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Kristin A Schuler-Hintz

Attorney at McCarthy & Holthus, LLP

9510 West Sahara Avenue, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Matthew Pawlowski

Attorney at McCarthy & Holthus, LLP

9510 W. Sahara, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89117

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Federal National Mortgage Association. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Magaster, Paige) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#3

(#3) STATUS REPORT by Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association. (Magaster, Paige) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/27/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/12/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/27/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/12/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATUS REPORT by Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association. (Magaster, Paige) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Federal National Mortgage Association. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Magaster, Paige) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-849809-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-6883573) by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Magaster, Paige) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T-SHACK, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal National Mortgage Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Quality Loan Service Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristin A. Schuler-Hintz