Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2020 at 09:56:23 (UTC).

T I A A Commercial Finance Inc v. DeQuincy Memorial Hospital Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 T I A A Commercial Finance Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DeQuincy Memorial Hospital Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01345

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TIAA Commercial Finance, Inc.

T I A A Commercial Finance Inc

Defendants

Christy B Matheson

CLHG-DeQuincy, LLC

DeQuincy Memorial Hospital, Inc.

John A Matheson

DeQuincy Memorial Hospital Inc

C L H G - DeQuincy L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher K Ralston

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar (NO)

365 Canal St Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

Lillian Marie Grappe

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar (NO)

365 Canal St Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by T I A A Commercial Finance Inc. C L H G - DeQuincy L L C waiver sent on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (aty,Ralston, Christopher) Modified to correct waiver sent and answer due date on 12/1/2020 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Tygris Commercial Finance Group Inc, Corporate Parent T I A A F S B by T I A A Commercial Finance Inc . (aty,Ralston, Christopher) Modified to add Corporate Parent on 10/20/2020 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Christopher K Ralston on behalf of T I A A Commercial Finance Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/30/2020. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to C L H G DeQuincy L L C, DeQuincy Memorial Hospital Inc, Christy B Matheson, John A Matheson. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

1 #9

Civil cover sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DeQuincy Memorial Hospital Inc, C L H G DeQuincy L L C, John A Matheson, Christy B Matheson (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4426459) filed by TIAA Commercial Finance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Christopher K Ralston added to party TIAA Commercial Finance, Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Ralston, Christopher) Modified to edit docket text on 10/16/2020 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by T I A A Commercial Finance Inc. C L H G - DeQuincy L L C waiver sent on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (aty,Ralston, Christopher) Modified to correct waiver sent and answer due date on 12/1/2020 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Tygris Commercial Finance Group Inc, Corporate Parent T I A A F S B by T I A A Commercial Finance Inc . (aty,Ralston, Christopher) Modified to add Corporate Parent on 10/20/2020 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Christopher K Ralston on behalf of T I A A Commercial Finance Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/30/2020. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to C L H G DeQuincy L L C, DeQuincy Memorial Hospital Inc, Christy B Matheson, John A Matheson. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DeQuincy Memorial Hospital Inc, C L H G DeQuincy L L C, John A Matheson, Christy B Matheson (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4426459) filed by TIAA Commercial Finance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Christopher K Ralston added to party TIAA Commercial Finance, Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Ralston, Christopher) Modified to edit docket text on 10/16/2020 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVERBANK COMMERCIAL FINANCE INC FORMERLY KNOWN AS TYGRIS VENDOR FINANCE INC FORMERLY KNOWN AS US EXPRESS LEASING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Kent Ralston