This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/12/2021 at 09:43:27 (UTC).

T. et al v. California Physicians Service

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 T filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against California Physicians Service. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are David Nuffer and Paul Kohler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00105

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Nuffer

Referral Judge

Paul Kohler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brad T.

A. T.

Defendants

Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance

Silver Full PPO 1700/40

California Physicians Service doing business as Blue Shield of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

G. Eric Nielson

Attorney at G ERIC NIELSON & ASSOCIATES

4790 S Holladay Blvd

Salt Lake City, UT 84117

Laura C. Nielson

Attorney at G ERIC NIELSON & ASSOCIATES

4790 S Holladay Blvd

Salt Lake City, UT 84117

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 10/14/21 (alt) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance. New Defendants: CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS SERVICE dba BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA,. Removed Defendants: BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, and SILVER FULL PPO 1700/40. filed by A. T., Brad T.. (Nielson, Laura) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by A. T., Brad T. as to California Physicians Service Waiver sent on 12/9/2021, answer due 2/7/2022. (Nielson, Laura) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by A. T., Brad T. as to California Physicians Service Waiver sent on 12/9/2021, answer due 2/7/2022. (Nielson, Laura) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance. New Defendants: CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS SERVICE dba BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA,. Removed Defendants: BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, and SILVER FULL PPO 1700/40. filed by A. T., Brad T.. (Nielson, Laura) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#5) DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/14/2021. (pjd) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 10/14/21 (alt) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4138198) filed by A. T., Brad T.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Nielson, Laura) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiffs Brad T., A. T. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLUE SHIELD OF CA LIFE & HEALTH INS. CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura C. Nielson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer G. Eric Nielson