This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 08:18:48 (UTC).

T. et al v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 T filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wyoming District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly H Rankin and Nancy D Freudenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00247

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wyoming District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly H Rankin

Presiding Judge

Nancy D Freudenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert T.

Maia T.

Defendant

Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brent J. Newton

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

336 S 300 E Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brian S. King

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

336 S 300 E Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Nediha Hadzikadunic

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

336 S 300 E Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brian S King

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

336 S 300 E Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Shelly K Flot

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SHELLY KAY FLOT

1623 Central Avenue, Po Box 2461

Cheyenne, WY 82001

Jessica Rutzick

Attorney at JESSICA RUTZICK & ASSOCIATES PC

P O Box 1867, 1685 North Pass Ranch Road

Wilson, WY 83014

Defendant Attorneys

Maralyn M. English

Attorney at SNOW CHRISTENSEN & MARTINEAU

10 Exchange Place 11Th Fl, Po Box 45000

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-5000

Lucas Evan Buckley

Attorney at HATHAWAY & KUNZ

2515 Warren Avenue, Suite 500

Cheyenne, WY 82001

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Rutzick on behalf of Robert T. and Maia T. (Rutzick, Jessica) Modified filer and text on 1/29/2020 (Court Staff, sjlg). (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#28

(#28) ORDER DISCHARGING #24 Order to Show Cause by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Accordingly, the deadline to show cause is discharged. (Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#27

(#27) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Brian King (Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2020 09:00 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Please see notice for instructions.) (Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shelly K Flot on behalf of Maia T., Robert T. (Flot, Shelly) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

24 #1

Email to Counsel

#24

(#24) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Plaintiffs shall show cause within ten (10) calendar days of this Order (01/18/2020) why the Complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 84.2. Because plaintiffs' lawyers are not registered for ECF in this case, the Clerk of Court's Office shall mail a copy of this order to them, and Plaintiffs' counsel shall promptly provide a copy to Plaintiffs. In addition, in the interest of expediency, the Clerk of Court shall also email a copy of this order to the address Plaintiffs' counsel provided in the Complaint, brian@briansking.com. Show Cause Response due by 1/18/2020. (Copy of this Order mailed via US Mail and emailed to plaintiffs' counsel on this date.) (Court Staff, sjlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2020: #1 Email to Counsel) (Court Staff, sjlg). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lucas Evan Buckley on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming (Buckley, Lucas) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#19

(#19) Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 2:19-cv-00269. (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming, Plaintiffs Maia T., Robert T.. Form due by 8/2/2019. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming, Plaintiffs Maia T., Robert T.. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint,. Answer deadline updated for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/17/2019. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 07/17/2019)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to

#5

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint,. Answer deadline updated for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/17/2019. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert T., Maia T. as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming Waiver sent on 5/23/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 05/28/2019)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint,. Answer deadline updated for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/17/2019. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiffs Maia T., Robert T. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/19/2019)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Rutzick on behalf of Robert T. and Maia T. (Rutzick, Jessica) Modified filer and text on 1/29/2020 (Court Staff, sjlg). (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER DISCHARGING #24 Order to Show Cause by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Accordingly, the deadline to show cause is discharged. (Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Brian King (Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2020 09:00 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Please see notice for instructions.) (Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shelly K Flot on behalf of Maia T., Robert T. (Flot, Shelly) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Plaintiffs shall show cause within ten (10) calendar days of this Order (01/18/2020) why the Complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 84.2. Because plaintiffs' lawyers are not registered for ECF in this case, the Clerk of Court's Office shall mail a copy of this order to them, and Plaintiffs' counsel shall promptly provide a copy to Plaintiffs. In addition, in the interest of expediency, the Clerk of Court shall also email a copy of this order to the address Plaintiffs' counsel provided in the Complaint, brian@briansking.com. Show Cause Response due by 1/18/2020. (Copy of this Order mailed via US Mail and emailed to plaintiffs' counsel on this date.) (Court Staff, sjlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2020: #1 Email to Counsel) (Court Staff, sjlg). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docket(#22) (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO RETAIN LOCAL COUNSEL. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. On December 5, 2019, the Court entered a text-only order for the parties to comply with USDCWY Local Rule 84.2 regarding local counsel within 14 days. Plaintiffs have not yet done so. However, the Court does not have a record of mailing the December 5 order to counsel. The Court permits Plaintiffs 14 days from this order to comply with Local Rule 84.2. The Clerk of Courts office shall mail a copy of the docket containing this order to counsel of record not yet registered in ECF. By the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal.(Court Staff, ssp) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lucas Evan Buckley on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming (Buckley, Lucas) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#20) (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR ALL PARTIES TO RETAIN LOCAL COUNSEL. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. On December 4, 2019, this Court received this case on transfer from the District of Utah. Each party is represented by counsel who is not a member of the Courts bar. The parties shall respectively comply with USDCWY Local Rule 84.2 within 14 days. by the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal.(Court Staff, ssp) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 2:19-cv-00269. (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2019
  • (#10) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Maia T. and Robert T. (nl) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#9) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming. (nl) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming, Plaintiffs Maia T., Robert T.. Form due by 8/2/2019. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming, Plaintiffs Maia T., Robert T.. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint,. Answer deadline updated for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/17/2019. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) Attorney Maralyn M. English added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming(pty:dft)(English, Maralyn) Modified on 7/17/2019 by correcting motion type(las). [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • (#4) REASSIGNMENT to Newly Appointed Magistrate Judge. Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 2:19-cv-00269-CMR. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (jwt) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert T., Maia T. as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming Waiver sent on 5/23/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3255723) filed by Robert T., Maia T.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiffs Maia T., Robert T. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less