This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2022 at 08:01:34 (UTC).

Szymanski v. Subaru of America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 Szymanski filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Subaru of America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Roger T. Benitez and Mitchell D. Dembin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00876

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roger T. Benitez

Referral Judge

Mitchell D. Dembin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katherine M. Szymanski

Defendant

Subaru of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Derek Andrew Soinski

Attorney at Redwood Law Group, APC

11440 West Bernardo Court, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92127

Julian McMillan

Attorney at McMillan Law Group

4655 Cass Street, Suite 404

San Diego, CA 92109

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan P. Ruggerello

Attorney at Ruggerello Law Group L.L.P.

19800 Macarthur Boulevard, Suite 650

Irvine, CA 92612

Kristan L. Ruggerello

Attorney at Ruggerello Law Group L.L.P.

19800 Macarthur Boulevard, Suite 650

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (alns) (jms). (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#3

(#3) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Sixth Claim for Relief Against Subaru of America, Inc. for Negligent Repair by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Ruggerello, Ryan)Attorney Ryan P. Ruggerello added to party Subaru of America, Inc.(pty:dft) QC Mailer re Document contains wrong signature (ddf). (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Subaru of America, Inc..(Ruggerello, Ryan) (ddf). (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation And Case Management Video Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/8/2022.(ddf) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Sixth Claim for Relief Against Subaru of America, Inc. for Negligent Repair by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Ruggerello, Ryan) (ddf). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER Granting Joint Motion To Dismiss Sixth Claim For Relief [ECF Nos. #3 , #6 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/13/2022. (ddf) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#8

(#8) Joint MOTION to Continue ENE and Case Management Conference by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Ruggerello, Ryan) (ddf). (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristan L. Ruggerello on behalf of Subaru of America, Inc. (Ruggerello, Kristan)Attorney Kristan L. Ruggerello added to party Subaru of America, Inc.(pty:dft) (ddf). (Entered: 08/02/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristan L. Ruggerello on behalf of Subaru of America, Inc. (Ruggerello, Kristan)Attorney Kristan L. Ruggerello added to party Subaru of America, Inc.(pty:dft) (ddf). (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion to Continue ENE/CMC: Upon due consideration, and good cause appearing, the Court GRANTS the parties' joint motion to continue. The Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference is CONTINUED to September 6, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. ENE briefs, a Joint Discovery Plan, and a list of participants shall be emailed to efile_dembin@casd.uscourts.gov on or before August 30, 2022. All other guidelines remain as previously set at ECF No. #5 . IT IS SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/28/2022. (no document attached) (bxr) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION to Continue ENE and Case Management Conference by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Ruggerello, Ryan) (ddf). (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Granting Joint Motion To Dismiss Sixth Claim For Relief [ECF Nos. #3 , #6 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/13/2022. (ddf) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Sixth Claim for Relief Against Subaru of America, Inc. for Negligent Repair by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Ruggerello, Ryan) (ddf). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation And Case Management Video Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/8/2022.(ddf) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Subaru of America, Inc..(Ruggerello, Ryan) (ddf). (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Sixth Claim for Relief Against Subaru of America, Inc. for Negligent Repair by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Ruggerello, Ryan)Attorney Ryan P. Ruggerello added to party Subaru of America, Inc.(pty:dft) QC Mailer re Document contains wrong signature (ddf). (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (alns) (jms). (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Subaru of America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16915964.), filed by Katherine M. Szymanski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-876-BEN-MDD. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (McMillan, Julian)(alns) (jms). (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation is a litigant