This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2021 at 07:19:21 (UTC).

SZUTER v. LENOX CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 SZUTER filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against LENOX CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSHUA D. WOLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01689

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSHUA D. WOLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATHY SZUTER

Defendant

LENOX CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPHANIE J. MENSING

Defendant Attorneys

HARRY MATTHEW TAYLOR

ALEXANDER NEMIROFF

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT COUNT II OF THE COMPLAINT ASSERTING A CLAIM UNDER THE PENNSYLVANIA HUMAN RELATIONS ACT (PHRA) IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF MAY AMEND THE COMPLAINT TO INCLUDE RIPE PHRA CLAIM(S) AT THE APPROPRIATE TIME. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 06/07/2021. 06/07/2021 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja,) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by HARRY MATTHEW TAYLOR on behalf of LENOX CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(TAYLOR, HARRY) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER NEMIROFF on behalf of LENOX CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CATHY SZUTER. LENOX CORPORATION waiver sent on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (MENSING, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Lenox Corporation on 04/12/2021 by CATHY SZUTER. Waiver of Service due by 5/12/2021. (MENSING, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to LENOX CORPORATION. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/9/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by CATHY SZUTER. (JL ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against LENOX CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15044356.), filed by CATHY SZUTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MENSING, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less