This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 17:54:42 (UTC).

SZUCS v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 SZUCS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen M. Williams and Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-11839

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen M. Williams

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSEPH SZUCS

Defendants

UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE

CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY

ATLANTIC COUNTY

JOHN DOES I THROUGH X

ABC COMPANIES 1 THROUGH X

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARC A. WEINBERG

Attorney at SAFFERN & WEINBERG

815 Greenwood Ave., Suite 22

Jenkintown, PA 19046

Defendant Attorney

MARGARET ANN MAHONEY

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, Suite 700

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

3 #7

Declaration of Kimberly Herbst

3 #6

Exhibit D to Mahoney Declaration

3 #5

Exhibit C to Mahoney Declaration

3 #4

Exhibit B to Mahoney Declaration

3 #3

Exhibit A to Mahoney Declaration

3 #2

Declaration of AUSA Margaret Mahoney

3 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. Responses due by 6/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Declaration of AUSA Margaret Mahoney, #3 Exhibit A to Mahoney Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Mahoney Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Mahoney Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Mahoney Declaration, #7 Declaration of Kimberly Herbst)(MAHONEY, MARGARET) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#2

(#2) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to time to Answer.. (MAHONEY, MARGARET) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Appendix COMPLAINT

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by POSTAL SERVICE UNITED STATES from ATLANTIC COUNTY LAW DIVISION, case number ATL-L-001288-21., filed by POSTAL SERVICE UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Appendix COMPLAINT, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAHONEY, MARGARET) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER Pursuant to L. CIV. R. 7.1.1 (eff. June 21, 2021), the parties, including intervening parties, are required to file a statement (separate from any pleading) containing specific information regarding third-party litigation funding. See L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(a)(1-3). This statement shall be filed within 45 days of the effective date of this Rule, or no later than August 5, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/28/21. (nar) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 7/19/2021 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. Responses due by 6/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Declaration of AUSA Margaret Mahoney, #3 Exhibit A to Mahoney Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Mahoney Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Mahoney Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Mahoney Declaration, #7 Declaration of Kimberly Herbst)(MAHONEY, MARGARET) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences. KMW. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (pr, ) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/17/2021. (rtm, ) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to time to Answer.. (MAHONEY, MARGARET) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Attorney Information,Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dd, ) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketJudge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by POSTAL SERVICE UNITED STATES from ATLANTIC COUNTY LAW DIVISION, case number ATL-L-001288-21., filed by POSTAL SERVICE UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Appendix COMPLAINT, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAHONEY, MARGARET) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant