This case was last updated from PACER on 02/10/2020 at 02:27:11 (UTC).

Szep v. General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 Szep filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James S. Gwin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02858

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James S. Gwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Szep

Defendant

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin J. Hawal

Attorney at DiCello Levitt & Gutzler

7556 Mentor Avenue

Mentor, OH 44060

Mark A. DiCello

Attorney at DiCello Levitt & Gutzler

7556 Mentor Avenue

Mentor, OH 44060

Defendant Attorneys

April N. Ross

Attorney at Crowell & Moring - Washington

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Denise A. Dickerson

Attorney at Sutter O'Connell - Cleveland

3600 Erieview Tower, 1301 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of April N. Ross in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appli

3 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#5

(#5) Attorney Appearance by Denise A. Dickerson filed by on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Dickerson, Denise) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against General Motors LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9669501. Filed by Thomas Szep. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (DiCello, Mark) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

1 #2

Summons

#3

(#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon General Motors LLC c/o CSC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#6

(#6) Motion for attorney April N. Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120.00, receipt number 0647-9769715, filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1Affidavit of April N. Ross in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dickerson, Denise) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Class Action Complaint filed by Thomas Szep. Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hawal, Justin) Modified tedxt on 12/13/2019 (S,SR). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

4 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Thomas Szep. Related document(s) #1 . (DiCello, Mark) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

6 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/7/2020 granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney April N. Ross for General Motors LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #6 )(S,KM) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion for attorney April N. Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120.00, receipt number 0647-9769715, filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1Affidavit of April N. Ross in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dickerson, Denise) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Attorney Appearance by Denise A. Dickerson filed by on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Dickerson, Denise) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • LAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Class Action Complaint filed by Thomas Szep. Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hawal, Justin) Modified tedxt on 12/13/2019 (S,SR). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon General Motors LLC c/o CSC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (B,R) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Thomas Szep. Related document(s) #1 . (DiCello, Mark) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand against General Motors LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9669501. Filed by Thomas Szep. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (DiCello, Mark) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.