This case was last updated from PACER on 01/21/2020 at 09:36:18 (UTC).

SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD. v. SLYCE ACQUISITION INC.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against SLYCE ACQUISITION INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN M. YOUNGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05516

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN M. YOUNGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD.

Defendant

SLYCE ACQUISITION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARC DURANT

Attorney at DURANT & DURANT LLC

1098 Washington Crossing Road, Suite 3

Washington Crossing, PA 18977-1343

GUY YONAY

Attorney at PEARL COHEN ZEDEK LATZER LLP

1500 Broadway 12Th Fl

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorney

MELANIE A. MILLER

Attorney at COZEN O'CONNOR

1900 Market St.

Philadelphia, PA 19103-3508

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew K. Gates ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14032561.) filed by SLYCE ACQUISITION INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, MELANIE) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael Chibib ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14032520.) filed by SLYCE ACQUISITION INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, MELANIE) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER THAT A FRCP 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 3/24/20 AT 11:00 AM IN CHAMBERS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/8/20. 1/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MELANIE A. MILLER on behalf of SLYCE ACQUISITION INC. with Certificate of Service(MILLER, MELANIE) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF GUY YONAY, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 12/24/19.12/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTY.(kw, ) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Guy Yonay, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14006769.) filed by SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD..Certificate of Service.(DURANT, MARC) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

4 #7

Exhibit G to Complaint

4 #6

Exhibit Fto Complaint

4 #5

Exhibit E to Complaint

4 #4

Exhibit D to Complaint

4 #3

Exhibit C to Complaint

4 #2

Exhibit B to Complaint

4 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint

#4

(#4) Exhibits by SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD. re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Fto Complaint, #7 Exhibit G to Complaint)(DURANT, MARC) Modified on 12/23/2019 (fb). (Entered: 12/22/2019)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD.. All Defendants. (DURANT, MARC) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against SLYCE ACQUISITION INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207246.), filed by SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD..(bw, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew K. Gates ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14032561.) filed by SLYCE ACQUISITION INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, MELANIE) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael Chibib ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14032520.) filed by SLYCE ACQUISITION INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, MELANIE) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER THAT A FRCP 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 3/24/20 AT 11:00 AM IN CHAMBERS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/8/20. 1/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MELANIE A. MILLER on behalf of SLYCE ACQUISITION INC. with Certificate of Service(MILLER, MELANIE) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF GUY YONAY, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 12/24/19.12/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTY.(kw, ) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Guy Yonay, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14006769.) filed by SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD..Certificate of Service.(DURANT, MARC) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Exhibits by SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD. re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Fto Complaint, #7 Exhibit G to Complaint)(DURANT, MARC) Modified on 12/23/2019 (fb). (Entered: 12/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD.. All Defendants. (DURANT, MARC) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • 1 Summons Issued as to SLYCE ACQUISITION INC.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 11/25/2019 (bw, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD..(bw, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD.. (bw, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against SLYCE ACQUISITION INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207246.), filed by SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD..(bw, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less