This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2020 at 07:47:25 (UTC).

Syroka v. Michigan, State of et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 Syroka filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Michigan, State of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillip J. Green and Janet T. Neff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01007

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

Presiding Judge

Janet T. Neff

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Derek Syroka

Holt, MI 48842

Defendants

Gretchen Whitmer

Michigan, State of

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Attachment 1

#9

(#9) SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 by plaintiff Derek Syroka (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5) (clw) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

9 #3

Attachment 3

9 #2

Attachment 2

9 #5

Attachment 5

9 #4

Attachment 4

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Derek Syroka (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachements, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ndj) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

1 #1

Miscellaneous Attachements

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

8 #3

Attachment 3

8 #4

Attachment 4

#8

(#8) OBJECTION by plaintiff Derek Syroka to Report and Recommendation #7 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4) (jlg) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

8 #2

Attachment 2

8 #1

Attachment 1

#7

(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#5

(#5) EXHIBIT re #1 by plaintiff Derek Syroka (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (ndj) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 by plaintiff Derek Syroka (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5) (clw) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) OBJECTION by plaintiff Derek Syroka to Report and Recommendation #7 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4) (jlg) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Report and Recommendation #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Derek Syroka (ndj) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Derek Syroka (ndj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Derek Syroka (ndj) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXHIBIT re #1 by plaintiff Derek Syroka (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (ndj) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Derek Syroka (ndj) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of receipt of case (ndj) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Derek Syroka; (ndj) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Derek Syroka (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachements, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ndj) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.