This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2021 at 08:36:46 (UTC).

Syracuse Mountains Corporation v. Petroleos de Venezuela S.A.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Syracuse Mountains Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Petroleos de Venezuela S A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02684

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Syracuse Mountains Corporation

Defendants

Petrleos de Venezuela S.A.

Petroleos de Venezuela S.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicolas Swerdloff

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP (NY)

One Battery Park Plaza

New York, NY 10004

Michael DeBernardis, I

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

1775 I St., Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorneys

Richard C. Lorenzo

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP (miami)

1111 Brickell Avenue,Suite 1900

Miami, FL 33131

Dennis H. Tracey, III

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP (NYC)

390 Madison Ave.

New York, NY 10017

Catherine Bratic

609 Main Street, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

#23

#22

#20

#18

#14

#13

#12

#11

#9

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Petroleos de Venezuela S.A. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff must respond to Defendant's motion not later than June 18, 2021. Plaintiff may either oppose the motion or amend its complaint, not both. If Plaintiff chooses to oppose the motion, Defendant may reply in further support not later than July 2, 2021. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 6/18/2021, Replies due by 7/2/2021.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/24/2021) (ama) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Petroleos de Venezuela S.A...(Tracey, Dennis) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Petroleos de Venezuela S.A...(Tracey, Dennis) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Catherine Bratic to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned litigation in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/17/2021) (js) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Catherine Bratic to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Catherine Bratic to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Petroleos de Venezuela S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Catherine Bratic, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (TX), #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Bratic, Catherine) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #19 Letter filed by Syracuse Mountains Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: The May 14, 2021 TPTC is canceled. Discovery is STAYED pending the Court's decision on Defendant's forthcoming motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/07/2021) (ama) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Nicolas Swerdloff and Dennis H. Tracey dated May 6, 2021 re: Initial Pretrial Conference/Joint Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Syracuse Mountains Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order).(Swerdloff, Nicolas) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #17 Motion for Richard C. Lorenzo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/05/2021) (ama) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Richard C. Lorenzo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nicolas Swerdloff. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Petrleos de Venezuela S.A.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nicolas Swerdloff. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand none; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Syracuse Mountains Corporation..(Swerdloff, Nicolas) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Syracuse Mountains Corporation..(Swerdloff, Nicolas) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Swerdloff, Nicolas) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Petrleos de Venezuela S.A.. Document filed by Syracuse Mountains Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Swerdloff, Nicolas) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Petrleos de Venezuela S.A.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24321520)Document filed by Syracuse Mountains Corporation..(Swerdloff, Nicolas) Modified on 3/30/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis H. Tracey, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard C. Lorenzo