This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/22/2020 at 20:03:33 (UTC).

Synopsys, Inc. v. Real Intent, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/23/2020 Synopsys, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Real Intent, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02819

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synopsys, Inc.

Defendant

Real Intent, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Krista Sue Schwartz

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

3 Embarcadero Center #1500

San Francisco, CA 94111

Helen Yiea Trac

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

3 Embarcadero Ctr, Ste 1500

San Francisco, CA 94111

Patrick Thomas Michael

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, Suite 1500

San Francisco, CA 94111

Aaron Stafford Oakley

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

One Tabor Center, Suite 1500, 1200 Seventeenth St.

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan K.M. Wong

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Brian L. Ferrall

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Robert Addy Van Nest

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Kristin Elizabeth Hucek

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest and Peters LLP

833 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Victor T. Chiu

Attorney at Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#7

#6

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibits 1-19 to Complaint

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint byReal Intent, Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 6/19/2020) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Real Intent, Inc.. (Ferrall, Brian) (Filed on 5/19/2020) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Real Intent, Inc. (Ferrall, Brian) (Filed on 5/19/2020) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Victor T. Chiu (Chiu, Victor) (Filed on 5/19/2020) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Elizabeth Hucek (Hucek, Kristin) (Filed on 5/19/2020) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan K.M. Wong (Wong, Ryan) (Filed on 5/19/2020) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L. Ferrall (Ferrall, Brian) (Filed on 5/19/2020) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Addy Van Nest (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/19/2020) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Synopsys, Inc. re #9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #8 Summons Issued (Schwartz, Krista) (Filed on 5/12/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Aaron S. Oakley. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2020 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Real Intent, Inc. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14413022.) filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Oakley, Aaron) (Filed on 4/27/2020) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Yiea Trac as Counsel for Plaintiff Synopsys, Inc. (Trac, Helen) (Filed on 4/24/2020) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Thomas Michael as Counsel for Plaintiff Synopsys, Inc. (Michael, Patrick) (Filed on 4/24/2020) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Synopsys, Inc. PLAINTIFF SYNOPSYS, INC.'S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 (Schwartz, Krista) (Filed on 4/24/2020) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Schwartz, Krista) (Filed on 4/23/2020) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement, Breach of Contract, Breach of Implied Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Patent Infringement against Real Intent, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14403540.). Filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-19 to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schwartz, Krista) (Filed on 4/23/2020) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synopsys, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristin E. Hucek

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Victor T. Chiu