This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/18/2022 at 14:17:19 (UTC).

Synopsys, Inc. v. Dolphin Technology, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 Synopsys, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Dolphin Technology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-06207

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synopsys, Inc.

Defendant

Dolphin Technology, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Denise Marie Mingrone

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Jonathan J. Liu

Attorney at Orrick Herrington Sutcliff LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Defendant Attorney

Steven C. Vondran

Attorney at The Law Offices of Steven C. Vondran, PC

One Sansome Street, Suite 3500

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #42 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2022 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2022) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#42

(#42) JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: Continuing Further Case Management Conference filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 5/16/2022) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#40

(#40) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 3/15/2022) Modified on 3/15/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#38

(#38) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 1/13/2022) Modified on 1/19/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#37

(#37) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Settlement Conference held on 1/12/2022.Total Time in Court: 6:45. Recorded Via Zoom: 3:45pm - 4:05pm. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#35

(#35) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/16/2021. See pdf image for further details. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2022 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroad casting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom /. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2022 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only.Total Time in Court: 5 Minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorneys: Denise Mingrone, Jonathan Liu. Defendant Attorney: Steve Vondran. Attachment: Minute Order. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/16/2021) (Entered: 11/25/2021)

9 #3

Proposed Order

9 #2

Declaration of Denise Mingrone Ex Parte Motion for TRO + OSC + Exp Discovery

#9

#8

#7

6 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #42 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2022 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2022) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: Continuing Further Case Management Conference filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 5/16/2022) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket(#41) CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference reset from 3/22/2022, to 5/31/2022, at 3:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 3/15/2022) Modified on 3/15/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docket(#39) CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2022 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 1/13/2022) Modified on 1/19/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Settlement Conference held on 1/12/2022.Total Time in Court: 6:45. Recorded Via Zoom: 3:45pm - 4:05pm. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docket(#36) ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. This matter is scheduled for a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/12/2022. Pursuant to the Courts Settlement Conference Standing Order, the parties were required to lodge settlement conference statements on or before 1/3/2022, 9 calendar days prior to the settlement conference. Defendant has not lodged their statement as required. To ensure the Court is able to adequately prepare for the settlement conference, Defendants statement must be received (do not file) via email to KAWsettlement@cand.uscourts.gov by 12:00 noon on 1/5/2022. The soft copy must include bookmarks for any attached exhibits. Failure to timely lodge the statement will result in the Court vacating the settlement conference. Defendant need not lodge a hard copy. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/4/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2022) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/16/2021. See pdf image for further details. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2022 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroad casting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom /. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2022 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only.Total Time in Court: 5 Minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorneys: Denise Mingrone, Jonathan Liu. Defendant Attorney: Steve Vondran. Attachment: Minute Order. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/16/2021) (Entered: 11/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket(#34) CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted acces s to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; OSC; and Expedited Discovery filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Norman Kelly Ex Parte Motion for TRO + OSC + Exp Discovery, #2 Declaration of Denise Mingrone Ex Parte Motion for TRO + OSC + Exp Discovery, #3 Proposed Order)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 8/17/2021) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of #8 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright Infringement emailed to Register of Copyrights. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyrights Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Dolphin Technology, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORRECTED Certificate of Interested Entities by Synopsys, Inc. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 8/11/2021) Modified on 8/13/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Synopsys, Inc. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 8/11/2021) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 8/11/2021) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Violation of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act 17 U.S.C. 1201 and Copyright Infringement against Dolphin Technology, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 0971-16274804.). Filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 8/11/2021) Modified on 8/13/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less