This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2022 at 07:42:29 (UTC).

Synology Inc. v. Via Licensing Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 Synology Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Via Licensing Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard Seeborg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01405

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synology Inc.

Defendant

Via Licensing Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Cook Bernstein

Theresa H Nguyen

Defendant Attorneys

Laura Kabler Oswell

Aviv Shaul Halpern

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2022) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#4

(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE: You are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2022 01:30 PM has been rescheduled to 6/29/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu All counsel and parties may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr. The joint case management conference statement is due on 6/22/2022. Plaintiff shall serve the Defendant with a copy of this Clerk's Notice and file a proof of service with the court. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. (Bernstein, Matthew) (Filed on 3/16/2022) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Via Licensing Corporation. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Synology Inc... (Bernstein, Matthew) (Filed on 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 3/18/2022. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2022) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Synology Inc.. Via Licensing Corporation served on 3/18/2022, answer due 4/8/2022. (Bernstein, Matthew) (Filed on 3/21/2022) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Kabler Oswell (Oswell, Laura) (Filed on 4/1/2022) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#13

(#13) Certificate of Interested Entities by Via Licensing Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Sony Corporation, Other Affiliate NEC Corp., Other Affiliate Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Other Affiliate Panasonic Corp., Other Affiliate Dolby International AB, Other Affiliate Orange S.A., Other Affiliate Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Foerderung der angewandten Forschung, e.V., Other Affiliate NTT DOCOMO, Inc., Other Affiliate VoiceAge Corporation, Other Affiliate Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute, Other Affiliate Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Sony Group Corporation, Other Affiliate AT&T Intellectual Property, LLC, Other Affiliate JVC KENWOOD Corporation, Other Affiliate Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation, Other Affiliate Koninklijke Philips N.V., Other Affiliate Microsoft Corp., Other Affiliate Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Other Affiliate Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation for Via Licensing Corporation. (Oswell, Laura) (Filed on 4/1/2022) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Complaint filed by Via Licensing Corporation. (Oswell, Laura) (Filed on 4/1/2022) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Aviv Shaul Halpern (Halpern, Aviv) (Filed on 4/1/2022) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#16

(#16) Certificate of Interested Entities by Synology Inc. (Bernstein, Matthew) (Filed on 4/14/2022) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Certificate of Interested Entities by Synology Inc. (Bernstein, Matthew) (Filed on 4/14/2022) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Aviv Shaul Halpern (Halpern, Aviv) (Filed on 4/1/2022) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Complaint filed by Via Licensing Corporation. (Oswell, Laura) (Filed on 4/1/2022) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Certificate of Interested Entities by Via Licensing Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Sony Corporation, Other Affiliate NEC Corp., Other Affiliate Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Other Affiliate Panasonic Corp., Other Affiliate Dolby International AB, Other Affiliate Orange S.A., Other Affiliate Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Foerderung der angewandten Forschung, e.V., Other Affiliate NTT DOCOMO, Inc., Other Affiliate VoiceAge Corporation, Other Affiliate Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute, Other Affiliate Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Sony Group Corporation, Other Affiliate AT&T Intellectual Property, LLC, Other Affiliate JVC KENWOOD Corporation, Other Affiliate Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation, Other Affiliate Koninklijke Philips N.V., Other Affiliate Microsoft Corp., Other Affiliate Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Other Affiliate Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation for Via Licensing Corporation. (Oswell, Laura) (Filed on 4/1/2022) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Kabler Oswell (Oswell, Laura) (Filed on 4/1/2022) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Synology Inc.. Via Licensing Corporation served on 3/18/2022, answer due 4/8/2022. (Bernstein, Matthew) (Filed on 3/21/2022) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022

Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for June 23, 2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by June 16, 2022. All parties shall appear by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2022) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 3/18/2022. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2022) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Synology Inc... (Bernstein, Matthew) (Filed on 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Via Licensing Corporation. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. (Bernstein, Matthew) (Filed on 3/16/2022) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE: You are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2022 01:30 PM has been rescheduled to 6/29/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu All counsel and parties may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr. The joint case management conference statement is due on 6/22/2022. Plaintiff shall serve the Defendant with a copy of this Clerk's Notice and file a proof of service with the court. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2022) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2022

Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/18/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2022) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and for Breach of the Implied Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing against Via Licensing Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16962628.). Filed bySynology Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bernstein, Matthew) (Filed on 3/4/2022) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less