This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/05/2019 at 08:05:02 (UTC).

Synkloud Technologies, LLC v. Adobe, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 Synkloud Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Adobe, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00527

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synkloud Technologies, LLC

Defendant

Adobe, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin James Terrazas

Attorney at Cleveland Terrazas PLLC

4611 Bee Cave Rd., #306 B

Austin, TX 78746

Deepali A. Brahmbhatt

One Llp, 4000 Macarthur Blvd., East Tower, Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

John E. Lord

One Llp, 9301 Wilshire Blvd., Penthouse Suite

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Defendant Attorneys

Eugene Y. Mar

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel, LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Winston Liaw

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel, LLP

236 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Sushila Chanana

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel, LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, P.C.

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Winston Liaw ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12710913) by on behalf of Adobe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Eugene Y. Mar ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12705446) by on behalf of Adobe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Sushila Chanana ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12705419) by on behalf of Adobe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Adobe, Inc.. Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Adobe, Inc.(pty:dft) (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Adobe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

1 #14

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #13

Exhibit 3F

1 #12

Exhibit 3E

1 #11

Exhibit 3D

1 #9

Exhibit 3B

1 #6

Exhibit 2E

1 #4

Exhibit 2C

1 #3

Exhibit 2B

1 #1

Exhibit 1

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Winston Liaw ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12710913) by on behalf of Adobe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Reset Deadlines: Adobe, Inc. answer due 11/25/2019. (am) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Eugene Y. Mar ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12705446) by on behalf of Adobe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Sushila Chanana ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12705419) by on behalf of Adobe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including November 25, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Adobe, Inc.. Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Adobe, Inc.(pty:dft) (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Adobe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin James Terrazas John Lord ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12593286) by on behalf of Synkloud Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terrazas, Kevin) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin James Terrazas Deepali Brahmbhatt ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12593256) by on behalf of Synkloud Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terrazas, Kevin) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Adobe, Inc. (lad) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Synkloud Technologies, LLC. (Terrazas, Kevin) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Synkloud Technologies, LLC. (Terrazas, Kevin) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12574013), filed by Synkloud Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2A, #3 Exhibit 2B, #4 Exhibit 2C, #5 Exhibit 2D, #6 Exhibit 2E, #7 Exhibit 2F, #8 Exhibit 3A, #9 Exhibit 3B, #10 Exhibit 3C, #11 Exhibit 3D, #12 Exhibit 3E, #13 Exhibit 3F, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Terrazas, Kevin) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADOBE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SynKloud Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Winston Liaw

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eugene Y. Mar