This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2019 at 09:24:15 (UTC).

Syngenta Seeds, LLC v. Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 Syngenta Seeds, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Troy L. Nunley and Carolyn K. Delaney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01986

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Troy L. Nunley

Referral Judge

Carolyn K. Delaney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Syngenta Seeds, LLC

Defendant

Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Ross Warne

Attorney at Downey Brand, LLP

621 Capitol Mall, 18Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Hari Santhanam, PHV

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Russell E. Levine, PHV

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Caroline Lourgos, PHV

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant Attorneys

Carson Dean Anderson

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3000 El Camino Real, Building 5, Suite 500

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Deborah E. Fishman

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3000 El Camino Real, Building 5, Suite 500

Palo Alto, CA 94306

 

Court Documents

17 #8

Proposed Order

17 #7

Exhibit E

17 #6

Exhibit D

17 #5

Exhibit C

17 #4

Exhibit B

17 #3

Exhibit A

17 #2

Declaration of Carson Anderson

17 #1

Points and Authorities

#17

(#17) MOTION to DISMISS by Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Carson Anderson, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Proposed Order)(Fishman, Deborah) Modified on 11/20/2019 (Huang, H). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#16

(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc. (Fishman, Deborah) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION regarding Extension of Time for Responding to #1 Complaint by Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc. (Fishman, Deborah) Modified on 10/21/2019 (Huang, H). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Carson Dean Anderson on behalf of Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc.. Attorney Anderson, Carson Dean added. (Anderson, Carson) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Deborah E. Fishman on behalf of Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc.. Attorney Fishman, Deborah E. added. (Fishman, Deborah) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Syngenta Seeds, LLC served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Warne, William) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 12 - 21

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - 11

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc. by Syngenta Seeds, LLC. Attorney Warne, William Ross added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8492198) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 11, #2 Exhibit 12 - 21, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Warne, William) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to DISMISS by Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Carson Anderson, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Proposed Order)(Fishman, Deborah) Modified on 11/20/2019 (Huang, H). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc. (Fishman, Deborah) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION regarding Extension of Time for Responding to #1 Complaint by Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc. (Fishman, Deborah) Modified on 10/21/2019 (Huang, H). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Carson Dean Anderson on behalf of Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc.. Attorney Anderson, Carson Dean added. (Anderson, Carson) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Deborah E. Fishman on behalf of Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc.. Attorney Fishman, Deborah E. added. (Fishman, Deborah) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Syngenta Seeds, LLC served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Warne, William) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/3/2019 GRANTING #6 Application as to Attorney Hari Santhanam, PHV to represent Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/3/2019 GRANTING #5 Application as to Attorney Caroline Lourgos, PHV to represent Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/3/2019 GRANTING #4 Application as to Attorney Russell E. Levine, PHV to represent Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PATENT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Patent #1:* 6,759,576 * * 07/06/2004 * * Syngenta Seeds, LLC * Patent #2:* 7,528,298 * * 05/05/2009 * * Syngenta Seeds, LLC * Patent #3:* 7,071,374 * * 07/04/2006 * * Syngenta Seeds, LLC * Patent #4:* 7,550,652 * * 06/23/2009 * * Syngenta Seeds, LLC * ; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Patent Report, #3 VDRP) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William Ross Warne* *Downey Brand, LLP* *621 Capitol Mall, 18th Floor* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Syngenta Seeds, LLC for attorney Hari Santhanam to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8492392) (Warne, William) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Syngenta Seeds, LLC for attorney Caroline Lourgos to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8492380) (Warne, William) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Syngenta Seeds, LLC for attorney Russell E. Levine to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8492357) (Warne, William) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT of FILING PATENT CASE by Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Warne, William) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Warne, William) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc. by Syngenta Seeds, LLC. Attorney Warne, William Ross added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8492198) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 11, #2 Exhibit 12 - 21, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Warne, William) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SYNGENTA SEEDS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deborah E. Fishman(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carson Dean Anderson