This case was last updated from PACER on 11/01/2020 at 09:26:17 (UTC).

Symbology Innovations, LLC v. NozzTeq Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 Symbology Innovations, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against NozzTeq Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Julie S. Sneed. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02060

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charlene Edwards Honeywell

Referral Judge

Julie S. Sneed

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Symbology Innovations, LLC

Defendant

NozzTeq Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Wernow

Attorney at Sand & Sebolt

4940 Munson Street Nw, Suite 1100

Canton, OH 44718

Defendant Attorney

Cole Carlson

Attorney at GrayRobinson, PA

401 E Jackson St Ste 2700

Tampa, FL 33601-3324

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Symbology Innovations, LLC. (Wernow, Howard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by NozzTeq Inc.. (Carlson, Cole) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before October 29, 2020. The parties shall meet and confer to prepare a Case Management Report, which shall be filed on or before November 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on September 29, 2020. (TLM) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by NozzTeq Inc. (Carlson, Cole) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Modified on 9/29/2020 (DG). (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Symbology Innovations, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Symbology Innovations, LLC.. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit A-Related Cases

#8

(#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Symbology Innovations, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Related Cases)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#7

(#7) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/17/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/3/2020. (BGS) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#6

(#6) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - PATENT track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/17/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/3/2020. (BGS) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#5

(#5) Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (CRH) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to NozzTeq Inc. (CRH) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Symbology Innovations, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Symbology Innovations, LLC. (Wernow, Howard) Modified on 9/3/2020 (AG). (Entered: 09/02/2020)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B-Claim Chart

1 #1

Exhibit A-US8424752

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NozzTeq Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17260848) filed by Symbology Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8424752, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 12, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on October 29, 2020. (TLM) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Symbology Innovations, LLC. (Wernow, Howard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by NozzTeq Inc.. (Carlson, Cole) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before October 29, 2020. The parties shall meet and confer to prepare a Case Management Report, which shall be filed on or before November 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on September 29, 2020. (TLM) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by NozzTeq Inc. (Carlson, Cole) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Modified on 9/29/2020 (DG). (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Symbology Innovations, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Symbology Innovations, LLC.. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Symbology Innovations, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Related Cases)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/17/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/3/2020. (BGS) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - PATENT track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/17/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/3/2020. (BGS) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (CRH) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to NozzTeq Inc. (CRH) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:20-cv-2060-T-36JSS. (SJB) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Symbology Innovations, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Symbology Innovations, LLC. (Wernow, Howard) Modified on 9/3/2020 (AG). (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NozzTeq Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17260848) filed by Symbology Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8424752, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less