This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/17/2021 at 12:02:52 (UTC).

Symbology Innovations LLC v. Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Symbology Innovations LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00159

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Symbology Innovations LLC

Defendant

Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jay B. Johnson

Attorney at Kizzia Johnson PLLC

1910 Pacific Avenue, Suite 13000

Dallas, TX 75201

Andrew S. Curfman

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt & Wemow Co., LPA

Aegis Tower - Suite 1100, 4940 Munson Street Nw

Canton, OH 44718

 

Court Documents

#1

#14

#13

#12

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Symbology Innovations LLC without Prejudice (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER re #11 Stipulation filed by Symbology Innovations LLC, Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC answer due 4/19/2021.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Symbology Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Symbology Innovations LLC. Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew S. Curfman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew S. Curfman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14526836) by on behalf of Symbology Innovations LLC. (Curfman, Andrew) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/26/2021) (cc3). (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC. (klw) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Symbology Innovations LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, along with a copy of the Complaint. (cj) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Andrew S. Curfman re: non-admitted status. (cj) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Symbology Innovations LLC. (cj) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Symbology Innovations LLC . (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Original Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14490384), filed by Symbology Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLDWELL BANKER REAL ESTATE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Symbology Innovations, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S. Curfman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay Brett Johnson