This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2022 at 12:34:26 (UTC).

SWM International LLC v. DynaEnergetics Europe GMBH et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 SWM International LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DynaEnergetics Europe GMBH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara M. G. Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01769

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara M. G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWM International LLC

Defendant

DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Natalie A Bennett

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

C Erik Hawes

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1000 Louisiana St, Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Elizabeth M Chiaviello

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1717 Main Street, Suite 3200

Dallas, TX 75201-7347

Kathryn Feiereisel

110 North Wacker Drive, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Barry J Herman

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson US LLP

100 Light Street, 26Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202

John F Morrow

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson US LLP

1 W 4Th St

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

Rajkumar Vinnakota

Attorney at Cole Schotz P.C.

901 Main Street, Suite 4120

Dallas, TX 75202

Sean Nean Hsu

Attorney at Cole Schotz P.C.

901 Main Street, Suite 4120

Dallas, TX 75202

Vishal H Patel

Attorney at COLE SCHOTZ, P.C.

901 Main St, Suite 4120

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

88 #6

Exhibit(s) F - Hunting Titans Trial Exhibit List with DynaEnergetics Objections

88 #5

Exhibit(s) E - Petitioners Corrected Response to Patent Owners Post Hearing Brie

88 #4

Exhibit(s) D - Patent Owners Post Hearing Brief

88 #3

Exhibit(s) C - Patent Owners Motion to Exclude

88 #2

Exhibit(s) B - Petitioners Reply

88 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Motion Hearing Transcript

88 #88

Main Document

#87

(#87) RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH re: #84 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Post-Grant Review Proceedings before the Patent Trial and Appeal Board (Vinnakota, Rajkumar) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

84 #1

Proposed Order

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent SWM International Holdings, LLC for SWM International, LLC. (Feiereisel, Kathryn) [Transferred from Colorado on 8/12/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Summons DynaEnergetics US Summons

1 #5

Summons DynaEnergetics Europe Summons

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D- JDP Patent Assignment

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C- Public Eng Agreement Between David Parks and DynaEnergetics

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B- Foreign Assignment Between David Parks and DynaEnergetics

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A- US Assignment Between David Parks and DynaEnergetics

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DynaEnergetics Europe GMBH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8042961)Attorney Kathryn Ann Feiereisel added to party SWM International, LLC(pty:pla), filed by SWM International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- US Assignment Between David Parks and DynaEnergetics, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Foreign Assignment Between David Parks and DynaEnergetics, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Public Eng Agreement Between David Parks and DynaEnergetics, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D- JDP Patent Assignment, #5 Summons DynaEnergetics Europe Summons, #6 Summons DynaEnergetics US Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Feiereisel, Kathryn) [Transferred from Colorado on 8/12/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) Appendix in Support filed by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH re #87 Response/Objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Post-Grant Review Proceedings before the Patent Trial and Appeal Board (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Motion Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Petitioners Reply, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Patent Owners Motion to Exclude, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Patent Owners Post Hearing Brief, #5 Exhibit(s) E - Petitioners Corrected Response to Patent Owners Post Hearing Brief, #6 Exhibit(s) F - Hunting Titans Trial Exhibit List with DynaEnergetics Objections) (Vinnakota, Rajkumar) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH re: #84 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Post-Grant Review Proceedings before the Patent Trial and Appeal Board (Vinnakota, Rajkumar) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) CERTIFICATE of Conference re #84 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Post-Grant Review Proceedings before the Patent Trial and Appeal Board by Natalie A Bennett on behalf of SWM International LLC (Bennett, Natalie) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Appendix in Support filed by SWM International LLC re #84 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Post-Grant Review Proceedings before the Patent Trial and Appeal Board (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Natalie A. Bennett (A001-A002), #2 Exhibit(s) 1 (A003-A090), #3 Exhibit(s) 2 (A091-A116)) (Bennett, Natalie) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Post-Grant Review Proceedings before the Patent Trial and Appeal Board filed by SWM International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bennett, Natalie) Modified text on 10/4/2022 (ygl). (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) ORDER granting #82 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jonathon David Bergman terminated. Barry J. Herman is hereby designated as Lead Attorney for Defendant DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH. (Ordered by District Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/29/2022) (axm) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jonathon D. Bergman filed by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vinnakota, Rajkumar) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) ORDER: By 10/3/2022, Plaintiff SWM International LLC shall submit a brief, not to exceed ten pages, in support of its request to stay this case pending completion of the Patent Trial and Appeal Board's review of U.S. Patent No. 10,844,697. By 10/10/2022, Defendants shall file a response, not to exceed ten pages. The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #77 ) is hereby STAYED until the Court issues its decision on Plaintiff's request to stay this case. (Ordered by District Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/26/2022) (ndt) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Docket(#80) ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: The Court conducted a status conference. Attorney Appearances - Plaintiff: Natalie Bennett, Elizabeth Chiaviello, Erik Hawes. Defendants: Barry Herman, Kumar Vinnakota. (Court Reporter: Deborah Kriegshauser). Time in Court: 0:15. (chmb) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Notice Requesting Status Conference. ECF No. #76 . A status conference is SET for 9/26/2022, at 2:00 p.m. CST, via Zoom. The Zoom link will be emailed to counsel when it becomes available (Ordered by District Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/21/2022) (ndt) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth M. Chiaviello on behalf of SWM International, LLCAttorney Elizabeth M. Chiaviello added to party SWM International, LLC(pty:pla) (Chiaviello, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Colorado on 8/12/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Natalie A. Bennett on behalf of SWM International, LLCAttorney Natalie A. Bennett added to party SWM International, LLC(pty:pla) (Bennett, Natalie) [Transferred from Colorado on 8/12/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by C. Erik Hawes on behalf of SWM International, LLCAttorney C. Erik Hawes added to party SWM International, LLC(pty:pla) (Hawes, C.) [Transferred from Colorado on 8/12/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 8/12/2022.] (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS REQUEST as to DynaEnergetics US, Inc. by Plaintiff SWM International, LLC. (Feiereisel, Kathryn) [Transferred from Colorado on 8/12/2022.] (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS REQUEST as to DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH by Plaintiff SWM International, LLC. (Feiereisel, Kathryn) [Transferred from Colorado on 8/12/2022.] (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. Summons submitted has incorrect caption and not issued. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (jsalz, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 8/12/2022.] (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (jsalz, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 8/12/2022.] (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent SWM International Holdings, LLC for SWM International, LLC. (Feiereisel, Kathryn) [Transferred from Colorado on 8/12/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DynaEnergetics Europe GMBH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8042961)Attorney Kathryn Ann Feiereisel added to party SWM International, LLC(pty:pla), filed by SWM International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- US Assignment Between David Parks and DynaEnergetics, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Foreign Assignment Between David Parks and DynaEnergetics, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Public Eng Agreement Between David Parks and DynaEnergetics, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D- JDP Patent Assignment, #5 Summons DynaEnergetics Europe Summons, #6 Summons DynaEnergetics US Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Feiereisel, Kathryn) [Transferred from Colorado on 8/12/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less