This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/26/2022 at 09:14:56 (UTC).

Swirlate IP LLC v. Parsons Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 Swirlate IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Parsons Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Seeger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03333

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Seeger

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Swirlate IP LLC

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Parsons Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

David Randolph Bennett

Attorney at Direction IP Law

P.O. Box 14184, 2620 N. Burling St.,

Chicago, IL 60614

Steven G Kalberg

Attorney at Direction IP Law

P.O. Box 14184

Chicago, IL 60614

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Aaron P. Pirouznia

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Neil J. Mcnabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.c.

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Robert Douglas Leighton

Attorney at Goldberg Kohn

55 East Monroe, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60603-5792

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice (Dckt. No. #18 is granted. Attorney Aaron P. Pirouznia is added as counsel for Parsons Corporation. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#18

(#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19761909. (Pirouznia, Aaron) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to counterclaim by Swirlate IP LLC(Bennett, David) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

#16

(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Parsons Corporation, Defendant Parsons Corporation by Robert Douglas Leighton (Leighton, Robert) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Parsons Corporation (Mcnabnay, Neil) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Parsons Corporation against Swirlate IP LLC . by Parsons Corporation(Mcnabnay, Neil) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Parsons Corporation by Neil J. Mcnabnay (Mcnabnay, Neil) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE by David Randolph Bennett of Change of Address (Bennett, David) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Swirlate IP LLC as to Parsons Corporation on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Swirlate IP LLC by David Randolph Bennett (Bennett, David) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Swirlate IP LLC (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Swirlate IP LLC by Steven G Kalberg (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit C Prosecution History Response to Office Action July 17, 2008

1 #3

Exhibit B United States Patent No. 7,567,622

1 #2

Exhibit A United States Patent No. 7,154,961

1 #1

Exhibit List

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice (Dckt. No. #18 is granted. Attorney Aaron P. Pirouznia is added as counsel for Parsons Corporation. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19761909. (Pirouznia, Aaron) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to counterclaim by Swirlate IP LLC(Bennett, David) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Parsons Corporation, Defendant Parsons Corporation by Robert Douglas Leighton (Leighton, Robert) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Parsons Corporation (Mcnabnay, Neil) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Parsons Corporation against Swirlate IP LLC . by Parsons Corporation(Mcnabnay, Neil) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Parsons Corporation by Neil J. Mcnabnay (Mcnabnay, Neil) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by David Randolph Bennett of Change of Address (Bennett, David) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Swirlate IP LLC as to Parsons Corporation on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's counsel signed the complaint without offering a street address. It simply says that Direction IP Law is located at PO Box 14184 in Chicago. Plaintiff's counsel must file their complete address by July 15, 2022. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Parsons Corporation (kra, ) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: IT APPEARING THAT new case number 22-cv-03333 was assigned in error using an incorrect category (Civil Category 2 instead of the Civil Category 1); IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the assignment of 22-cv-03333 to Judge Manish S. Shah be vacated; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case 22-cv-03333 be reassigned by lot to the next available judge using the appropriate category (Civil Category 1). Case reassigned to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger for all further proceedings. Honorable Manish S. Shah no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/22.(gcy, ) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant PARSONS CORPORATION (dxb, ) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Swirlate IP LLC by David Randolph Bennett (Bennett, David) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (khg, ) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (khg, ) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Swirlate IP LLC (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Swirlate IP LLC by Steven G Kalberg (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Swirlate IP LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19596279. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A United States Patent No. 7,154,961, #3 Exhibit B United States Patent No. 7,567,622, #4 Exhibit C Prosecution History Response to Office Action July 17, 2008)(Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Swirlate IP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PARSONS TRUSTEE, PETER S is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Douglas Leighton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron Potter Pirouznia