This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2022 at 05:56:59 (UTC).

Swinomish Indian Tribal Community v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Swinomish Indian Tribal Community filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against McKinsey Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-04489

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Swinomish Indian Tribal Community

Defendant

McKinsey & Company Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dan Drachler

Attorney at Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP

1904 Third Avenue, Suite 1030

Seattle, WA 98101-1170

Henry J. Avery

Attorney at Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling

1904 Third Avenue, Suite 1030

Seattle, WA 98101

Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Eric B. Fastiff

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Elizabeth Joan Cabraser

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Paulina do Amaral

Attorney at Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

250 Hudson Street, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10013-1413

Kevin R. Budner

Attorney at Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann and Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery St., 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Defendant Attorney

Amanda K. Baker

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

#7

6 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1 - Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to

#6

5 #7

Exhibit D-4

5 #6

Exhibit D-3

5 #5

Exhibit D-2

5 #4

Exhibit D-1

5 #2

Exhibit B

#5

1 #1

Complaint

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Paulina do Amaral (do Amaral, Paulina) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit (Levin-Gesundheit, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin R. Budner (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Fastiff (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Joan Cabraser (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2996: Northern District of Ohio (Cleveland), 1:21-op-45033-DAP, Swinomish Indian Tribal Community v. McKinsey & Company, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-04489-CRB pursuant to Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:21-op-45033. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Transfer Order by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 2996 McKinsey & Company, Inc., National Prescription Consultant Litigation. Case transferred to the Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer(P,R) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint)Related document(s) #1 .(Baker, Amanda) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing With the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-1, #5 Exhibit D-2, #6 Exhibit D-3, #7 Exhibit D-4, #8 Exhibit D-5, #9 Exhibit D-6, #10 Exhibit D-7, #11 Exhibit D-8, #12 Exhibit D-9, #13 Exhibit D-10, #14 Exhibit D-11, #15 Exhibit D-12, #16 Exhibit D-13, #17 Exhibit D-14, #18 Exhibit D-15, #19 Exhibit D-16, #20 Exhibit D-17, #21 Exhibit E)(Baker, Amanda) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Attorney Appearance by Amanda K. Baker filed by on behalf of McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Baker, Amanda) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Swinomish Indian Tribal Community. McKinsey & Company, Inc. waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021 filed on behalf of Swinomish Indian Tribal Community (Avery, Henry) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Attorney Appearance by Henry J. Avery filed by on behalf of Swinomish Indian Tribal Community. (Avery, Henry) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against McKinsey & Company, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10689169. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804-DAP. Filed by Swinomish Indian Tribal Community. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Swinomish Indian Tribal Community is a litigant

Latest cases where MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Kathryn Baker