This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2021 at 06:57:07 (UTC).

Swinomish Indian Tribal Community v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Swinomish Indian Tribal Community filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against McKinsey Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45033

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Swinomish Indian Tribal Community

Defendant

McKinsey & Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Henry J. Avery

Attorney at Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling

1904 Third Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101

Dan Drachler

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein

1904 Third Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorney

Amanda K. Baker

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland

127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase transferred from Ohio Northern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:21-cv-04489, filed 06/10/2021.Related document(s) #7 . (M,TL) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Transfer Order by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 2996 McKinsey & Company, Inc., National Prescription Consultant Litigation. Case transferred to the Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer(P,R) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint)Related document(s) #1 .(Baker, Amanda) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing With the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-1, #5 Exhibit D-2, #6 Exhibit D-3, #7 Exhibit D-4, #8 Exhibit D-5, #9 Exhibit D-6, #10 Exhibit D-7, #11 Exhibit D-8, #12 Exhibit D-9, #13 Exhibit D-10, #14 Exhibit D-11, #15 Exhibit D-12, #16 Exhibit D-13, #17 Exhibit D-14, #18 Exhibit D-15, #19 Exhibit D-16, #20 Exhibit D-17, #21 Exhibit E)(Baker, Amanda) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Attorney Appearance by Amanda K. Baker filed by on behalf of McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Baker, Amanda) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Swinomish Indian Tribal Community. McKinsey & Company, Inc. waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021 filed on behalf of Swinomish Indian Tribal Community (Avery, Henry) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Attorney Appearance by Henry J. Avery filed by on behalf of Swinomish Indian Tribal Community. (Avery, Henry) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against McKinsey & Company, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10689169. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804-DAP. Filed by Swinomish Indian Tribal Community. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Swinomish Indian Tribal Community is a litigant

Latest cases where MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Kathryn Baker