This case was last updated from PACER on 03/17/2020 at 08:30:10 (UTC).

Swington v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 Swington filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C. Bramlette, III and Michael T. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00008

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Bramlette, III

Referral Judge

Michael T. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jadarea Swington

Defendant

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward Taylor Polk

Attorney at HEILMAN LAW GROUP, PA

4266 Interstate 55 North, Suite 106

Jackson, MS 39211

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION for Minia E. Bremenstul to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4208744) by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Dowdle, Lindsay) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#7

(#7) Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2020 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 3/20/20. (KPM) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (MGB) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Charge and Right to Sue Letter

6 #1

Attachment Certificate of Good Standing

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Dowdle, Lindsay) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jadarea Swington. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. (Polk, Edward) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Jennifer F. Kogos to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4208732) by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Dowdle, Lindsay) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4185846), filed by Jadarea Swington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge and Right to Sue Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

5 #1

Attachment Certificate of Good Standing

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2020 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 3/20/20. (KPM) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jennifer F. Kogos and Minia E. Bremenstul are hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 14, 2020 (KPM) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Minia E. Bremenstul to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4208744) by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Dowdle, Lindsay) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Jennifer F. Kogos to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4208732) by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Dowdle, Lindsay) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Dowdle, Lindsay) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jadarea Swington. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. (Polk, Edward) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (MGB) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4185846), filed by Jadarea Swington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge and Right to Sue Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.