This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2021 at 07:05:37 (UTC).

Swing v. Hotz et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Swing filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hotz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03852

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael William Swing

Defendants

Jeffery Hotz

Titan Transfer, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Paul, Jr

Defendant Attorneys

James E. Gilson

Mark Daniel Christopher

Scott Harlan Moulton

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE by Titan Transfer, Inc. Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Gilson, James) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

#18

(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Amended by Michael William Swing.(Paul, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Amended by Michael William Swing.(Paul, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RFAs and Cert of Compliance by Michael William Swing.(Paul, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE by Michael William Swing RFA to Titan (Paul, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE by Michael William Swing RFA to Hotz (Paul, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Paul, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Discovery to Defendants by Michael William Swing.(Paul, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan: The Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified: per the Parties request, the Court assigns this case to a six (6)-month discovery period, to close on April 22, 2022. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/22/21. (ceo) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#6

Clerks Notation re #6 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jeffery Hotz, Titan Transfer, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Protective Insurance Company for Titan Transfer, Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Titan Transfer, Inc..(Christopher, Mark) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jeffery Hotz. Discovery ends on 2/22/2022.(Christopher, Mark) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit -B

1 #1

Exhibit -A

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/11/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) NOTICE by Titan Transfer, Inc. Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Gilson, James) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Amended by Michael William Swing.(Paul, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Amended by Michael William Swing.(Paul, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RFAs and Cert of Compliance by Michael William Swing.(Paul, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) NOTICE by Michael William Swing RFA to Titan (Paul, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) NOTICE by Michael William Swing RFA to Hotz (Paul, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Paul, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Discovery to Defendants by Michael William Swing.(Paul, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan: The Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified: per the Parties request, the Court assigns this case to a six (6)-month discovery period, to close on April 22, 2022. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/22/21. (ceo) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Titan Transfer, Inc..(Christopher, Mark) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Initial Disclosures by Jeffery Hotz, Titan Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Christopher, Mark) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Jeffery Hotz, Titan Transfer, Inc.. (Gilson, James) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Paul, Jr on behalf of Michael William Swing (Paul, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2021
View Court Documents

DocketClerks Notation re #6 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jeffery Hotz, Titan Transfer, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Protective Insurance Company for Titan Transfer, Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jeffery Hotz, Titan Transfer, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Protective Insurance Company for Titan Transfer, Inc.. (Christopher, Mark) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Titan Transfer, Inc..(Christopher, Mark) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/24/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jeffery Hotz. Discovery ends on 2/22/2022.(Christopher, Mark) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/24/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE Of Filing, Entry of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel of MICHAEL D. PAUL on behalf of Michael William Swing by Michael William Swing. (Filed in Clayton County State Court on 8/23/21 and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Jeffery Hotz and Titan Transfer, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11266550) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less