This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2019 at 10:56:39 (UTC).

SWIKE v. MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 SWIKE filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Doris L. Pryor and Jane Magnus-Stinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01200

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERIN SWIKE

Defendant

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert E. Duff

Attorney at INDIANA CONSUMER LAW GROUP

P.O. Box 7251

Fishers, IN 46037

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas David O'Conner

Attorney at LOCKE LORD LLP

111 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael P. McGivney

Attorney at LOCKE LORD LLP

111 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 4100

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#15

#14

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit C, February 28, 2019, letter

1 #2

Exhibit B, January 11, 2019, letter

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to August 12, 2019 to file a stipulation to dismiss, filed by Defendant MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Conner, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to 7/12/2019 for the parties to file their dismissal documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/19/2019. (CBU) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to July 12, 2019 to finalize settlement, filed by Defendant MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Conner, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER Directing Filing of Documents Authorizing Dismissal:The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED. Within thirty (30) days of the date of this entry, counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal (consistent with the agreement of the parties). Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/14/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, filed by Plaintiff ERIN SWIKE (Duff, Robert) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2019 11:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/26/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. McGivney on behalf of Defendant MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.. (McGivney, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ***DUPLICATE FILING, PLEASE SEE #9 *** NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. McGivney on behalf of Defendant MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.. (McGivney, Michael) Modified on 4/26/2019 (JDH). (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.. (O'Conner, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas David O'Conner on behalf of Defendant MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.. (O'Conner, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (NLR) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.(NLR) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Duff on behalf of Plaintiff ERIN SWIKE. (Duff, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., filed by ERIN SWIKE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5351903) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, January 5, 2019, letter, #2 Exhibit B, January 11, 2019, letter, #3 Exhibit C, February 28, 2019, letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Duff, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E. Duff