This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2022 at 13:53:12 (UTC).

Swiger et al v. A.R. Wilfley & Sons, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 Swiger filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A R Wilfley Sons, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Irene C. Berger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00117

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Irene C. Berger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryan K. Swiger

Defendants

Zurn Industries, Inc.

PREMIERE REFRACTORIES, INC.

Brand Insulations, Inc.

BW/IP, Inc.

Borg-Warner Corporation

Crane Co.

Cashco, Inc.

Riley Power, Inc.

Flowserve Corporation

The William Powell Company

Rain Bird Corporation

Clark-Reliance Corporation

John Crane, Inc.

Uniroyal, Inc.

Adience Company, LP

Ingersoll-Rand Company

West Virginia Electric Supply Company

Hornor Brothers Engineers

Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation

87 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John David Hurst

Attorney at MOTLEY RICE

Suite 1, 50 Clay Street

Morgantown, WV 26501

Other Attorneys

Joseph W. Selep

Attorney at ZIMMER KUNZ

3300 Usx Tower, 600 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2702

Patricia M. Bello

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

Suite 1400, 707 Virginia Street, East

Charleston, WV 25301

Aaron H. Weiss

Attorney at ZIMMER KUNZ

Suite 3000, 310 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Matthew A. Nelson

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

Suite 1400, 707 Virginia Street East

Charleston, WV 25301

Joseph S. Beeson

Attorney at ROBINSON & McELWEE

P. O. Box 1791

Charleston, WV 25326-1791

Mark H. Hayes

Attorney at ROBINSON & McELWEE

P. O. Box 1791

Charleston, WV 25326-1791

Craig S. Beeson

Attorney at ROBINSON & MCELWEE

P. O. Box 1791

Charleston, WV 25326-1791

 

Court Documents

#5

#8

#7

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

3 #2

Proposed Order

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

2 #1

Consent to Removal by Mueller Co. LLC

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by Clerk, Circuit Court of Kanawha County, West Virginia, of receipt of case file pursuant to the #5 Memorandum Opinion and Order remanding this civil action. (ts)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER to Clerk, Circuit Court of Kanawha County, West Virginia, from Clerk, USDC/SDWV, dated 2/12/2020, re: transmitting case file pursuant to the Court's #5 Memorandum Opinion and Order entered 2/12/2020, remanding this civil action. (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #5 Memorandum Opinion and Order to Clerk of theCircuit Court of Kanawha Count; counsel of record and any unrepresented party. (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #3 EMERGENCY MOTION by Bryan K. Swiger, Lyle Swiger to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County; directing that this case be REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, West Virginia for further proceedings; that any motion seeking an award of costs and fees associated with the removal of this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) be filed no later than 03/06/2020; any such motion shall be accompanied by a calculation of applicable costs, supporting affidavits or other evidence, and associated briefing. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 2/12/2020. (cc: Clerk of the Circuit Court of Kanawha Count; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EMERGENCY MOTION by Bryan K. Swiger, Lyle Swiger to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County and Memorandum of Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Hurst, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONSENT FOR REMOVAL by Core & Main LP, Mueller Co. LLC. (Attachment: #1 Consent to Removal by Mueller Co. LLC) (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. with summons, Short Form Complaint, Amended Short Form Complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7540946. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rain Bird Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CASHCO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BRAND INSULATIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION is a litigant