This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/29/2021 at 08:37:13 (UTC).

SWIFT v. GUADENZIA, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 SWIFT filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against GUADENZIA, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. RUFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01503

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIZABETH SWIFT

Defendant

GUADENZIA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JEREMY M. CERUTTI

Attorney at KARPF KARPF & CERUTTI PC

3331 Street Road, Two Greenwood Sq Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

ARI RISSON KARPF

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI, P.C.

3331 Street Road, Two Greenwood Square, Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

ALLISON AILEEN BARKER

Attorney at KARPF KARPF & CERUTTI PC

3331 Street Rd, Two Greenwood Sq Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELIZABETH SWIFT. GUADENZIA, INC. waiver sent on 4/1/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON AILEEN BARKER on behalf of ELIZABETH SWIFT (BARKER, ALLISON) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY M. CERUTTI on behalf of ELIZABETH SWIFT (CERUTTI, JEREMY) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GUADENZIA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15019504.), filed by ELIZABETH SWIFT.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELIZABETH SWIFT. GUADENZIA, INC. waiver sent on 4/1/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON AILEEN BARKER on behalf of ELIZABETH SWIFT (BARKER, ALLISON) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to GUADENZIA, INC. Emailed to counsel on 3/30/21 (mbh, ) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by ELIZABETH SWIFT. (tjd) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY M. CERUTTI on behalf of ELIZABETH SWIFT (CERUTTI, JEREMY) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GUADENZIA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15019504.), filed by ELIZABETH SWIFT.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEREMY M. CERUTTI

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALLISON AILEEN BARKER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARI R. KARPF