This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2022 at 07:21:05 (UTC).

Sweeney v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 Sweeney filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-03667

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christina Sweeney

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Madison Tate Donaldson

Attorney at Marc Whitehead Assoc.

430 Heights Boulevard

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorneys

Linda P Wills

Attorney at Wilson Elser et al

909 Fannin Street, Ste 3300

Houston, TX 77010

Michael Frederick Webb

Attorney at Wilson Elser et al

909 Fannin Street, Ste 3300

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27317808) filed by Christina Sweeney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Life Insurance Company of North America, filed.(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Christina Sweeney, filed.(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/8/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(RachelSalazaradi, 4) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Original Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to file their response is December 28, 2021..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America, filed.(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Life Insurance Company of North America, filed.(Webb, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Life Insurance Company of North America, filed.(Webb, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America, filed.(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to file their response is December 28, 2021..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Original Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/8/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(RachelSalazaradi, 4) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Christina Sweeney, filed.(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Life Insurance Company of North America, filed.(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27317808) filed by Christina Sweeney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda P Wills