This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 06:42:09 (UTC).

SWEATT v. RENAISSANCE ACQUISITION COMPANY, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 SWEATT filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against RENAISSANCE ACQUISITION COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Debra McVicker Lynch. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04911

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAM SWEATT

Defendants

RENAISSANCE ADMINISTRATION, LLC

RENAISSANCE ACQUISITION COMPANY, LLC

RENPSG

RENAISSANCE ADMINISTRATION, LLC doing business as RENAISSANCE PHILANTHROPIC SOLUTIONS GROUP also known as RENPSG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher E. Clark

Attorney at GOODIN ABERNATHY LLP

301 East 38Th Street

Indianapolis, IN 46205

Defendant Attorneys

Steven F. Pockrass

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Michelle R. Maslowski

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Setting Settlement Conference and Related Deadlines: Settlement Conference set for 6/8/2020 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. On or before three (3) business days before the conference, the parties shall submit (not file) a confidential settlement statement. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/10/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS SUBMITTED. Dispositive Motions due by 12/14/2020. Discovery due by 10/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/6/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on February 5, 2020, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Damages, filed by All Defendants.(Maslowski, Michelle) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants RENAISSANCE ACQUISITION COMPANY, LLC, RENAISSANCE ADMINISTRATION, LLC . (Maslowski, Michelle) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2020 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/7/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants RENAISSANCE ACQUISITION COMPANY, LLC, RENAISSANCE ADMINISTRATION, LLC. (Maslowski, Michelle) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by RENAISSANCE ACQUISITION COMPANY, LLC, RENAISSANCE ADMINISTRATION, LLC. (Maslowski, Michelle) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle R. Maslowski on behalf of Defendants RENAISSANCE ACQUISITION COMPANY, LLC, RENAISSANCE ADMINISTRATION, LLC. (Maslowski, Michelle) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven F. Pockrass on behalf of Defendants RENAISSANCE ACQUISITION COMPANY, LLC, RENAISSANCE ADMINISTRATION, LLC. (Pockrass, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to RENAISSANCE ACQUISITION COMPANY, LLC, RENAISSANCE ADMINISTRATION, LLC. (JRB) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher E. Clark on behalf of Plaintiff KAM SWEATT. (Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against RENAISSANCE ACQUISITION COMPANY, LLC, RENAISSANCE ADMINISTRATION, LLC, filed by KAM SWEATT. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5767269) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons)(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher E. Clark