This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/23/2021 at 08:34:02 (UTC).

Swartz v. Interventional Rehabilitation of South Florida, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 Swartz filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Interventional Rehabilitation of South Florida, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aileen M. Cannon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-14137

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aileen M. Cannon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sidney Swartz

Defendant

Interventional Rehabilitation of South Florida, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Greg Wenzel

Attorney at Wenzel Fenton Cabassa P.A.

1110 N. Florida Avenue, Suite 300

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Picone

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A.

101 East Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 1900

Tampa, FL 33602

Andrea E Nieto

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A.

101 East Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 1900, 33602

Tampa, FL 33602

Catherine Hope Molloy

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A.

101 E Kennedy Boulevard

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#3

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Interventional Rehabilitation of South Florida, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Scheduling Form, #2 Exhibit Proposed Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order Setting Civil Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule)(Molloy, Catherine) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Interventional Rehabilitation of South Florida, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Gilbert Drozdow, Other Affiliate Maria Rodriguez for Interventional Rehabilitation of South Florida, Inc. (Molloy, Catherine) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Sidney Swartz (Wenzel, Steven) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Interventional Rehabilitation of South Florida, Inc.. (Molloy, Catherine) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report,Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 5/21/2021. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea E Nieto on behalf of Interventional Rehabilitation of South Florida, Inc.. Attorney Andrea E Nieto added to party Interventional Rehabilitation of South Florida, Inc.(pty:dft). (Nieto, Andrea) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Hope Molloy on behalf of Interventional Rehabilitation of South Florida, Inc.. Attorney Catherine Hope Molloy added to party Interventional Rehabilitation of South Florida, Inc.(pty:dft). (Molloy, Catherine) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. On or before May 6, Defendant shall file a response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/13/2021. (jrt) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Interventional Rehabilitation of South Florida, Inc.. Attorney Joseph Picone added to party Interventional Rehabilitation of South Florida, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Picone, Joseph) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Interventional Rehabilitation of South Florida, Inc. (mee) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Interventional Rehabilitation of South Florida, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14549008, filed by Sidney Swartz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Wenzel, Steven) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERVENTIONAL REHABILITATION OF SOUTH FLORIDA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Picone

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrea E. Nieto

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Catherine H. Molloy