Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2020 at 09:07:27 (UTC).

Swartz v. GRJ Middletown LLC

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Swartz filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against GRJ Middletown LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan, William E. Smith and Mary S. McElroy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00321

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judges

William E. Smith

Mary S. McElroy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Helen Swartz

Defendant

GRJ Middletown LLC doing business as Ramada Middletown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kensley R. Barrett

Attorney at Law Office of Kensley R. Barrett, Esq., Inc.

127 Dorrance Street, Penthouse

Providence, RI 02903

Lawrence A. Fuller

Attorney at Fuller, Fuller & Associates, P.A.

12000 Biscayne Blvd., Suite 502

North Miami, FL 33181

Defendant Attorneys

Mary Welsh McBurney

Attorney at Hanson Curran LLP

One Turks Head Place, Suite 550

Providence, RI 02903

David P. Martland

Attorney at Silva, Thomas, Martland & Offenberg, Ltd

1100 Aquidneck Avenue, 849-6200, Fax: 849-1820

Middletown, RI 02842

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 9/11/2020. (Welsh McBurney, Mary) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by GRJ Middletown LLC.(Martland, David) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 8/28/2020. (Welsh McBurney, Mary) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Welsh McBurney on behalf of All Defendants (Welsh McBurney, Mary) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Helen Swartz. GRJ Middletown LLC served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (Fuller, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit Report of the Referee

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Helen Swartz in support of #4 MOTION for Lawrence A. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1533054 ) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report of the Referee)(Barrett, Kensley) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Lawrence A. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1533054 ) filed by Helen Swartz. (Barrett, Kensley) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to GRJ Middletown LLC. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

1 #2

summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1532774 ), filed by Helen Swartz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons)(Barrett, Kensley) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 9/11/2020. (Welsh McBurney, Mary) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by GRJ Middletown LLC.(Martland, David) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRJ Middletown LLC answer due 9/21/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 8/14/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 8/28/2020. (Welsh McBurney, Mary) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Welsh McBurney on behalf of All Defendants (Welsh McBurney, Mary) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Helen Swartz. GRJ Middletown LLC served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (Fuller, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCASE RANDOMLY ASSIGNED Since Judge District Judge William E. Smith has determined that this case is not related to previous matters cited as related this case has been randomly assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy for all further proceedings (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting (4) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence A. Fuller in case 1:20-cv-00320-WES-PAS; granting (4) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence A. Fuller in case 1:20-cv-00321-WES-PAS; granting (4) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence A. Fuller in case 1:20-cv-00322-WES-PAS. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 7/30/2020. (Saucier, Martha) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Lawrence A. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1533054 ) referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Helen Swartz in support of #4 MOTION for Lawrence A. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1533054 ) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report of the Referee)(Barrett, Kensley) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Lawrence A. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1533054 ) filed by Helen Swartz. (Barrett, Kensley) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Lawrence A. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1533054 ) filed by Helen Swartz. (Barrett, Kensley) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to GRJ Middletown LLC. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number CV20-320-WES-PAS was previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1532774 ), filed by Helen Swartz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons)(Barrett, Kensley) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less