This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2020 at 09:33:26 (UTC).

Swann Avenue Townhomes POA, Inc. v. Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 Swann Avenue Townhomes POA, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sean P. Flynn and Steven D. Merryday. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02214

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Merryday

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Swann Avenue Townhomes POA, Inc.

Defendant

Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company

Not Classified By Court

Jonathan C. Koch

Tampa, FL 33606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory Len Evans

Attorney at Boyle & Leonard, P.A.

309 S. Fielding Ave.

Tampa, FL 33606

Mark A. Boyle, Sr.

Attorney at Boyle & Leonard PA

2050 Mcgregor Blvd

Ft Myers, FL 33901

Jason W. Bruce

Attorney at Pursiano Barry Bruce Lavelle, LLP

655 W Morse Blvd Ste 112

Winter Park, FL 32789-3745

Defendant Attorneys

Gary Khutorsky

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo, LLP

600 Corporate Dr Ste 600

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33334-3611

Stephanie H. Carlton

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Jonathan C. Koch

Attorney at Jonathan C. Koch, Esq.

701 S Howard Ave Ste 202

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief Count III and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Khutorsky, Gary) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on January 22, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Jonathan C. Koch, Esq.. (Carlton, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

12 #2

Exhibit Severance Order

12 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Severance Order)(Carlton, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

7 #12

Exhibit

7 #11

Exhibit

7 #10

Exhibit

7 #9

Exhibit

7 #8

Exhibit

7 #7

Exhibit

7 #6

Exhibit

7 #5

Exhibit

7 #4

Exhibit

7 #3

Exhibit

7 #2

Exhibit

7 #1

Exhibit

#7

(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Swann Avenue Townhomes POA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Evans, Gregory) Modified on 10/22/2020 (DG). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief Count III and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Khutorsky, Gary) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on January 22, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Jonathan C. Koch, Esq.. (Carlton, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Severance Order)(Carlton, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER re mediation; see order for details concerning appearance at mediation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/2/2020. (GSO) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER appointing Jonathan C. Koch as mediator; designating Stephanie Carlton as lead counsel; setting 1/31/20201 as the mediation deadline; directing counsel to file a notice within seven days giving the date and time of mediation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/2/2020. (GSO) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial conference scheduled for 12/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 11B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn; jury trial scheduled for the January 2022 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/30/2020. (GSO) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Carlton, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Swann Avenue Townhomes POA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Evans, Gregory) Modified on 10/22/2020 (DG). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Strickland Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Auto Owners Insurance for Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Carlton, Stephanie) Modified on 10/8/2020 (DG). (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Swann Avenue Townhomes POA, Inc. Related case(s): yes. (Evans, Gregory) Modified on 10/7/2020 (DG). (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER re #3--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/22/2020. (GSO) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-2214-T-23SPF. (SJB) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit of Hillsborough County, case number 2019-CA-10189 filed in State Court on 10/3/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17332840 filed by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT PART 1 OF 2, #2 State Court COMPLAINT PART 2 OF 2, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Khutorsky, Gary) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan C. Koch