This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2022 at 08:59:04 (UTC).

Nicole Swain v. Enterprise Bank and Trust et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 Nicole Swain filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Enterprise Bank and Trust. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08728

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicole Swain

Defendants

First Choice Bank

Enterprise Bank and Trust

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Farshid Shawn Azizollahi

Gary S Brotman

Poya Ghasri

Defendant Attorneys

Christina Tellado

Mary T Vu

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Motion to Remand #12 , for the following reasons: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Case number is incorrect or missing. The Motion has been re-filed at Docket No. 13. This case was transferred to Judge Fitzgerald on 11/10/2021 (Docket No. 9). All documents must reflect the correct case number, CV 21-8728 MWF (Ex). (iv) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

13 #5

Proposed Order

13 #4

Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Gary S. Brotman

13 #3

Exhibit A to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint

13 #2

Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Gary S. Brotman

13 #1

Declaration of Gary S. Brotman

13 #13

Main Document

12 #5

Proposed Order Proposed Order

12 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Gary S. Brotman

12 #3

Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint

12 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Gary S. Brotman

12 #1

Declaration Declaration of Gary S. Brotman

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR JANUARY 31, 2022 11:00 AM AND FILING OF JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT AND OTHER COMPLIANCE REQUIREMENTS by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (lc) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEUDLING CONFERENCE FOR JANUARY 31, 2022 11:00 AM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (lc) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-08728 MWF(Ex). (rn) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/17/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Motion to Remand #12 , for the following reasons: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Case number is incorrect or missing. The Motion has been re-filed at Docket No. 13. This case was transferred to Judge Fitzgerald on 11/10/2021 (Docket No. 9). All documents must reflect the correct case number, CV 21-8728 MWF (Ex). (iv) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Norwalk Courthouse, Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by plaintiff Nicole Swain. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary S. Brotman, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Gary S. Brotman, #3 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Gary S. Brotman, #5 Proposed Order) (Brotman, Gary) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) **STRICKEN** NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Norwalk Courthouse, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by plaintiff Nicole Swain. Motion set for hearing on 1/14/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Gary S. Brotman, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Gary S. Brotman, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Gary S. Brotman, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Brotman, Gary) Modified on 12/17/2021 Per Order #14 (iv). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR JANUARY 31, 2022 11:00 AM AND FILING OF JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT AND OTHER COMPLIANCE REQUIREMENTS by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (lc) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEUDLING CONFERENCE FOR JANUARY 31, 2022 11:00 AM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (lc) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-08728 MWF(Ex). (rn) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Enterprise Bank and Trust. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/3/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT C TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Enterprise Bank and Trust, First Choice Bank, Does 1 through 50, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Nicole Swain. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/5/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Enterprise Bank & Trust. (Tellado, Christina) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Enterprise Bank & Trust, (Tellado, Christina) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Jada Reese re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Enterprise Bank & Trust. (Tellado, Christina) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Christina T. Tellado re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Enterprise Bank & Trust. (Tellado, Christina) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles - Norwalk, case number 21NWCV00656 Receipt No: ACACDC-32277852 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Enterprise Bank & Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Christina Tellado added to party Enterprise Bank & Trust(pty:dft))(Tellado, Christina) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less