This case was last updated from PACER on 10/14/2019 at 08:53:58 (UTC).

Swafford v. Ivey

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 a Other case was filed by Swafford against Ivey in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01320

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

John E Ott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeremy Swafford

Defendant

Governor Kay Ivey

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is not required to pay a partial filing fee, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 8/28/2019. (AHI) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy Swafford. (BJL) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Governor Kay Ivey filed by Jeremy Swafford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BJL) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is not required to pay a partial filing fee, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 8/28/2019. (AHI) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy Swafford. (BJL) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Governor Kay Ivey filed by Jeremy Swafford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BJL) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.