This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:27:45 (UTC).

Sutton v. Noel et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Sutton filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Noel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher C. Conner and CA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02080

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher C. Conner

Referral Judge

CA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelvin Sutton

Frackville, PA 17931

Defendants

Dr. Paul Noel

Dr. Haresh Pandya

Pennsylvania Department of Corrections

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Vincent R Mazeski

Attorney at Chief Counsel's Office

1920 Technology Parkway

Mechanicsburg, PA 17050

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

3 #1

0285

4 #1

IFP (civil rights)

#11

(#11) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dr. Paul Noel. (Mazeski, Vincent) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#2

(#2) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

2 #1

Notice of Consent

#8

(#8) Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to Dr. Paul Noel, Dr. Haresh Pandya Waiver of Service due by 1/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Labels)(mfa) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Kelvin Sutton.(lp) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kelvin Sutton.(kpf) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. ; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperisSigned by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/18/2019. (mfa) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Dr. Paul Noel. Dr. Paul Noel waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Mazeski, Vincent) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent R Mazeski on behalf of Dr. Paul Noel. (Mazeski, Vincent) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

8 #1

Mailing Labels

#4

(#4) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 12/06/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dr. Paul Noel. (Mazeski, Vincent) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent R Mazeski on behalf of Dr. Paul Noel. (Mazeski, Vincent) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Dr. Paul Noel. Dr. Paul Noel waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Mazeski, Vincent) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to Dr. Paul Noel, Dr. Haresh Pandya Waiver of Service due by 1/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Labels)(mfa) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. ; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperisSigned by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/18/2019. (mfa) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certified Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kelvin Sutton. (kpf) Modified on 12/17/2019 (lp). (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kelvin Sutton.(kpf) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 12/06/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 02/08/2011. (Attachments: #1 0285)(lp) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Kelvin Sutton.(lp) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.