This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2022 at 07:38:09 (UTC).

Sutton v. ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Sutton filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against ESRT 1333 Broadway, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03929

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stason Sutton

Defendants

ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C.

Urban Outfitters, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Glen Howard Parker

Attorney at Parker Hanski LLC

40 Worth Street, Suite 602

New York, NY 07043

Defendant Attorneys

Eve I. Klein

Attorney at Duane Morris, LLP (NYC)

1540 Broadway

New York, NY 10036-4086

Katelynn Mimi Gray

Attorney at Duane Morris, LLP (NYC)

1540 Broadway

New York, NY 10036-4086

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C., Urban Outfitters, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26145655)Document filed by Stason Sutton..(Parker, Glen) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Parker, Glen) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stason Sutton..(Parker, Glen) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Urban Outfitters, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stason Sutton..(Parker, Glen) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Urban Outfitters, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C...(pc) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C. served on 5/27/2022, answer due 6/17/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Stason Sutton..(Parker, Glen) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Urban Outfitters, Inc. served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Stason Sutton..(Parker, Glen) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eve I. Klein on behalf of ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C., Urban Outfitters, Inc...(Klein, Eve) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katelynn Mimi Gray on behalf of ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C., Urban Outfitters, Inc...(Gray, Katelynn) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#11

(#11) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #8 Affidavit of Service Complaints, #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued, #6 Summons Issued addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Eve I. Klein, Esq. dated July 7, 2022. Document filed by ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C., Urban Outfitters, Inc...(Klein, Eve) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff, STASON SUTTON ("Plaintiff"), and Defendant, ESRT 1333 BROADWAY, L.L.C. AND URBAN OUTFITTERS, INC., ("Defendant"), by and through their respective counsel, that the time for Defendant to answer or otherwise move in response to the Complaint shall be extended up to and including August 5, 2022. The parties hereby consent to electronic service of all documents per Rule 5(b)(2)(E) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C. answer due 8/5/2022; Urban Outfitters, Inc. answer due 8/5/2022., Motions terminated: #11 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #8 Affidavit of Service Complaints, #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued, #6 Summons Issued addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Eve I. Klein, Esq. dated July 7, 2022. filed by Urban Outfitters, Inc., ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C.. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/8/2022) (jca) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff, STASON SUTTON ("Plaintiff"), and Defendant, ESRT 1333 BROADWAY, L.L.C. AND URBAN OUTFITTERS, INC., ("Defendant"), by and through their respective counsel, that the time for Defendant to answer or otherwise move in response to the Complaint shall be extended up to and including August 5, 2022. The parties hereby consent to electronic service of all documents per Rule 5(b)(2)(E) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C. answer due 8/5/2022; Urban Outfitters, Inc. answer due 8/5/2022., Motions terminated: #11 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #8 Affidavit of Service Complaints, #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued, #6 Summons Issued addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Eve I. Klein, Esq. dated July 7, 2022. filed by Urban Outfitters, Inc., ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C.. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/8/2022) (jca) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #8 Affidavit of Service Complaints, #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued, #6 Summons Issued addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Eve I. Klein, Esq. dated July 7, 2022. Document filed by ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C., Urban Outfitters, Inc...(Klein, Eve) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katelynn Mimi Gray on behalf of ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C., Urban Outfitters, Inc...(Gray, Katelynn) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eve I. Klein on behalf of ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C., Urban Outfitters, Inc...(Klein, Eve) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Urban Outfitters, Inc. served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Stason Sutton..(Parker, Glen) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C. served on 5/27/2022, answer due 6/17/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Stason Sutton..(Parker, Glen) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C...(pc) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Urban Outfitters, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Urban Outfitters, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stason Sutton..(Parker, Glen) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stason Sutton..(Parker, Glen) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Parker, Glen) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ESRT 1333 Broadway, L.L.C., Urban Outfitters, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26145655)Document filed by Stason Sutton..(Parker, Glen) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where URBAN OUTFITTERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eve Irene Klein