This case was last updated from PACER on 12/21/2020 at 09:02:04 (UTC).

Sutton v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Sutton filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Kelly and G. Kendall Sharp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01962

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

Presiding Judge

G. Kendall Sharp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marvin Antonio Sutton, Jr.

Deland, FL 32720

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

SSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - FLM

Suite 3100, 400 W Washington St

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE and file a response for failure to comply with the Court's Order of October 23, 2020. Failure to comply with this Court may result in dismissal without prejudice or other appropriate sanctions. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 12/8/2020. (SC) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER adopting and approving #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff Marvin Antonio Sutton, Jr.'s Statement of Claim (Doc. 1-1 at 5-7) is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff Marvin Antonio Sutton, Jr. is granted leave to file an amended complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time permitted will result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 11/19/2020. (SC) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#6

(#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: It is RECOMMENDED that the Court: 1. DISMISS the case without prejudice; and 2. Grant Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within a time established by the Court, with the warning that failure to file an amended complaint within the time permitted by the Court will result in dismissal of the case without further notice. A party has fourteen days from this date to file written objections to the Report and Recommendation's factual findings and legal conclusions. Failure to file written objections waives that party's right to challenge on appeal any unobjected-to factual finding or legal conclusion the district judge adopts from the Report and Recommendation. 11th Cir. R. 3-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/26/2020. (MB) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 10/23/2020. (copy mailed) (AKC) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE and file a response for failure to comply with the Court's Order of October 23, 2020. Failure to comply with this Court may result in dismissal without prejudice or other appropriate sanctions. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 12/8/2020. (SC) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER adopting and approving #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff Marvin Antonio Sutton, Jr.'s Statement of Claim (Doc. 1-1 at 5-7) is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff Marvin Antonio Sutton, Jr. is granted leave to file an amended complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time permitted will result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 11/19/2020. (SC) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: It is RECOMMENDED that the Court: 1. DISMISS the case without prejudice; and 2. Grant Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within a time established by the Court, with the warning that failure to file an amended complaint within the time permitted by the Court will result in dismissal of the case without further notice. A party has fourteen days from this date to file written objections to the Report and Recommendation's factual findings and legal conclusions. Failure to file written objections waives that party's right to challenge on appeal any unobjected-to factual finding or legal conclusion the district judge adopts from the Report and Recommendation. 11th Cir. R. 3-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/26/2020. (MB) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#5) ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (SPM) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 10/23/2020. (copy mailed) (AKC) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-1962-Orl-18GJK. (SJB) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Commissioner of Social Security. Related case(s): y (Ragler, Phillip) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Volusia County Circuit Court, case number 2020 38084 COCI filed in State Court on 09/21/2020. filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ragler, Phillip) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less