This case was last updated from PACER on 07/09/2019 at 07:39:00 (UTC).

Sutton v. Allstate Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 Sutton filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane M. Virden and Debra M. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00074

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jane M. Virden

Presiding Judge

Debra M. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Hankins Sutton

Defendant

Allstate Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Levi Boone, III

Attorney at BOONE LAW FIRM

P. O. Box 1772

Cleveland, MS 38732-1772

Defendant Attorneys

David E. Stovall

Attorney at WILKINS PATTERSON, P.A.

4735 Old Canton Road, Suite 108 (39211), Post Office Box 13429

Jackson, MS 39236

Robert R. Stephenson

Attorney at WILKINS PATTERSON, P.A.

P. O. Box 13429

Jackson, MS 39236-3429

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint

#9

(#9) Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Mary Hankins Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Boone, Levi)

#8

(#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Status Conference held on 7/2/2019. (irw) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Plaintiff's counsel must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw)

6 #1

Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint

#6

(#6) MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint - State Court Unopposed by Mary Hankins Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Boone, Levi)

5 #15

Exhibit O Allstate Policy (Ex. A to Amended Complaint) 4 17 2019

5 #14

Exhibit N Amended Complaint 4 17 2019

5 #13

Exhibit M Correspondence from Attorney Hicks dated 3 28 2019

5 #12

Exhibit L Attorney Jenessa Carter Hicks Entry of Appearance on Behalf of Allstat

5 #10

Exhibit J Civil Cover Sheet 3 12 2019

5 #9

Exhibit I General Order re Local Rules

5 #8

Exhibit H General Order re Non-Filing of Discovery Materials for the Eleventh Ci

5 #7

Exhibit G General Order re Orders to be Approved by Attorneys for the Eleventh C

5 #6

Exhibit F General Order Setting Deadlines for the Eleventh Circuit Court Distric

5 #4

Exhibit D Allstate Issued Summons 3 12 2019

#5

(#5) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Civil Cover Sheet 3 12 2019, #2 Exhibit B Complaint 3 12 2019, #3 Exhibit C Allstate Policy (Ex. A to Complaint) 3 12 201, #4 Exhibit D Allstate Issued Summons 3 12 2019, #5 Exhibit E Letter of Assignment 3 19 2019, #6 Exhibit F General Order Setting Deadlines for the Eleventh Circuit Court District, #7 Exhibit G General Order re Orders to be Approved by Attorneys for the Eleventh Circuit Court District, #8 Exhibit H General Order re Non-Filing of Discovery Materials for the Eleventh Circuit Court District, #9 Exhibit I General Order re Local Rules, #10 Exhibit J Civil Cover Sheet 3 12 2019, #11 Exhibit K Correspondence from Attorney Boone dated 3 5 2019, #12 Exhibit L Attorney Jenessa Carter Hicks Entry of Appearance on Behalf of Allstate 3 29 2019, #13 Exhibit M Correspondence from Attorney Hicks dated 3 28 2019, #14 Exhibit N Amended Complaint 4 17 2019, #15 Exhibit O Allstate Policy (Ex. A to Amended Complaint) 4 17 2019, #16 Exhibit P Allstate Issued Summons 4 17 2019) (Stephenson, Robert)

#2

(#2) STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company, filed by Mary Hankins Sutton. (tab)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Mary Hankins Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Boone, Levi)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Status Conference held on 7/2/2019. (irw) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Plaintiff's counsel must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint - State Court Unopposed by Mary Hankins Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Boone, Levi)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Civil Cover Sheet 3 12 2019, #2 Exhibit B Complaint 3 12 2019, #3 Exhibit C Allstate Policy (Ex. A to Complaint) 3 12 201, #4 Exhibit D Allstate Issued Summons 3 12 2019, #5 Exhibit E Letter of Assignment 3 19 2019, #6 Exhibit F General Order Setting Deadlines for the Eleventh Circuit Court District, #7 Exhibit G General Order re Orders to be Approved by Attorneys for the Eleventh Circuit Court District, #8 Exhibit H General Order re Non-Filing of Discovery Materials for the Eleventh Circuit Court District, #9 Exhibit I General Order re Local Rules, #10 Exhibit J Civil Cover Sheet 3 12 2019, #11 Exhibit K Correspondence from Attorney Boone dated 3 5 2019, #12 Exhibit L Attorney Jenessa Carter Hicks Entry of Appearance on Behalf of Allstate 3 29 2019, #13 Exhibit M Correspondence from Attorney Hicks dated 3 28 2019, #14 Exhibit N Amended Complaint 4 17 2019, #15 Exhibit O Allstate Policy (Ex. A to Amended Complaint) 4 17 2019, #16 Exhibit P Allstate Issued Summons 4 17 2019) (Stephenson, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 State Court Record - Removal; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket entry #1 (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Stephenson, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss (Unopposed) and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Mary Hankins Sutton. (Boone, Levi)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company, filed by Mary Hankins Sutton. (tab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Bolvair County, Second Judicial District, case number 2019-0023. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1677602) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B State Court Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant