This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2022 at 08:37:17 (UTC).

Suttlar et al v. Thurston et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 Suttlar filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Thurston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00368

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Deborah Springer Suttlar

Judy Green

Fred Love

Kwami Abdul-Bey

Clarice Abdul-Bey

Paula Withers

Defendants

John Thurston

Sharon Brooks

Bilenda Harris-Ritter

William Luther

Charles Roberts

Wendy Brandon

Jamie Clemmer

James Harmon Smith, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron M. Mukerjee

10 G Street Ne, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20002

Marilyn Gabriela Robb

10 G Street Ne, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20002

Abha Khanna

1700 Seventh Avenue, Suite 2100

Seattle, WA 98101

Alexander Taylor Jones

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings

200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201-3699

Joshua L. Harris

10 G Street Ne, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20002

McKenzie L. Raub

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP

124 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2000

Little Rock, AR 72201-3740

Aria Branch

Attorney at Elias Law Group LLP

10 G Street Ne, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20002

Jess L. Askew, III

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP

124 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2000

Little Rock, AR 72201-3740

Defendant Attorneys

Dylan L. Jacobs

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building

Nicholas J. Bronni

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand, #11 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand; Response to Motion to Stay filed by All Defendants. (Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time; and giving the Defendants up to and including 6/3/2022, to respond to #9 Motion for Remand and #11 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/20/2022. (ldb) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#17

(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand, #11 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay by All Defendants (Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #13 plaintiffs' motion for extension of time; plaintiffs' deadline to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss shall be 14 days following the entry of this Court's ruling on plaintiffs' motion for remand #6 #9 #13 ; and granting #14 plaintiffs' motion for admission of counsel pro hac vice. Ms. Branch shall appear as counsel of record for plaintiffs along with Plaintiffs' Arkansas counsel. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/12/2022. (kdr) Docket text modified on 5/12/2022 to correct typographical error. (kbc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#15

(#15) Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #13 Motion for Extension of Time does not contain a statement that the movant contacted the adverse party with regard to the motion (Local Rule 6.2(b)). (jak) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Aria Branch. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4263631. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Askew, Jess) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay by All Plaintiffs (Askew, Jess) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#8

(#8) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/28/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/12/2022; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 5/1/2023 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 05/02/2022. (tmw) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#7

(#7) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#6

(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Plaintiffs (Askew, Jess) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2022: #2 Main Document - Correct (submitted 5/11/2022)) (jak) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Bronni on behalf of All Defendants (Bronni, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by McKenzie L. Raub on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (jbh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Alexander Taylor Jones on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (jbh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by Paula Withers, Fred Love, Judy Green, Kwami Abdul-Bey, Deborah Springer Suttlar, Clarice Abdul-Bey. (jbh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motions for Remand and Stay by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply)(Askew, Jess) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand, #11 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand; Response to Motion to Stay filed by All Defendants. (Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time; and giving the Defendants up to and including 6/3/2022, to respond to #9 Motion for Remand and #11 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/20/2022. (ldb) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand, #11 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay by All Defendants (Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #13 plaintiffs' motion for extension of time; plaintiffs' deadline to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss shall be 14 days following the entry of this Court's ruling on plaintiffs' motion for remand #6 #9 #13 ; and granting #14 plaintiffs' motion for admission of counsel pro hac vice. Ms. Branch shall appear as counsel of record for plaintiffs along with Plaintiffs' Arkansas counsel. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/12/2022. (kdr) Docket text modified on 5/12/2022 to correct typographical error. (kbc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #13 Motion for Extension of Time does not contain a statement that the movant contacted the adverse party with regard to the motion (Local Rule 6.2(b)). (jak) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Aria Branch. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4263631. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Askew, Jess) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Plaintiffs (Askew, Jess) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2022: #2 Main Document - Correct (submitted 5/11/2022)) (jak) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Motion to Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Askew, Jess) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay by All Plaintiffs (Askew, Jess) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of their Motion for Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Askew, Jess) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand by All Plaintiffs (Askew, Jess) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/28/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/12/2022; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 5/1/2023 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 05/02/2022. (tmw) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants (Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Bronni on behalf of All Defendants (Bronni, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by McKenzie L. Raub on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (jbh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Alexander Taylor Jones on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (jbh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by Paula Withers, Fred Love, Judy Green, Kwami Abdul-Bey, Deborah Springer Suttlar, Clarice Abdul-Bey. (jbh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-22-01849. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT086467. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Jacob Bronni

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dylan L. Jacobs