This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2021 at 09:49:51 (UTC).

Sutter's Place, Inc. v. Zurich American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Sutter's Place, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Zurich American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia K. DeMarchi and Edward J. Davila. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-09384

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Virginia K. DeMarchi

Presiding Judge

Edward J. Davila

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sutter's Place, Inc. a California Corportion doing business as Bay 101 Casino

Defendant

Zurich American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael John Bidart

Attorney at Shernoff Bidart & Darras

600 S. Indian Hill Boulevard

Claremont, CA 91711

Randy M. Hess

Attorney at Hess Bower Adams-Hess, PC

2105 S. Bascom Avenue, Suite 200

Campbell, CA 95008

Ricardo Echeverria

Attorney at Shernoff Bidart & Darras

600 So Indian Hill Blvd

Claremont, CA 91711

Defendant Attorneys

Alexander Beau Giraldo

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Christian D. Humphreys

Attorney at McKenna & Cuneo

750 B Street, Suite 3300

San Diego, CA 92101

Christian D. Humphreys,

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

4655 Executive Drive, Suite 700

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Declaration of Alexander B. Giraldo in Support of Notice of Removal

#2

#4

#5

#7

7 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#8) (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 1/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Zurich American Insurance Company.. (Giraldo, Alexander) (Filed on 1/12/2021) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/12/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., a Swiss corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., a Delaware corporation for Zurich American Insurance Company. (Giraldo, Alexander) (Filed on 12/29/2020) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1332, 1441 and 1446 from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV370406. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15376065). Filed byZurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Alexander B. Giraldo in Support of Notice of Removal)(Giraldo, Alexander) (Filed on 12/29/2020) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sutter's Place, Inc. a California Corportion doing business as Bay 101 Casino is a litigant

Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randy M. Hess

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Bidart